Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-03-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6011935) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet, # 2 Summons agency summons, # 3 Summons DOJ Summons, # 4 Summons USAO DC Summons, # 5 Declaration corporate disclosure)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/21/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 03/20/2019) |
2019-03-20 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-03-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 03/21/2019) |
2019-04-11 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Cirino on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/11/2019) |
2019-04-30 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-04-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/30/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 04/30/2019) |
2019-05-14 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT (Proposed Schedule) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 05/14/2019) |
2019-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by June 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/15/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 05/15/2019) |
2019-06-28 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 06/28/2019) |
2019-07-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/3/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
2019-08-15 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-08-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by September 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/15/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 08/15/2019) |
2019-09-30 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by October 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/30/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/30/2019) |
2019-10-30 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2019-10-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/30/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 10/30/2019) |
2019-12-13 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2019-12-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by February 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/13/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/13/2019) |
2020-02-03 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-02-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by February 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/3/2020. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-02-24 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 02/24/2020) |
2020-02-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by March 25, 2020, unless the parties file a stipulation of dismissal before then. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/25/2020. (lctjk1) (Entered: 02/25/2020) |
2020-03-25 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 17, 2020, unless the parties file a stipulation of dismissal before then. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/25/2020. (lctjk1) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-04-16 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Cirino, Paul) (Entered: 04/16/2020) |
Hide Docket Events |