Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-02-13 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6826012) filed by Accountable.US. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Summons as to DOT)(Pittard, William) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-02-13 | 2 | ERRATA Civil Cover Sheet [1-9] by ACCOUNTABLE. US 1 Complaint, filed by ACCOUNTABLE. US. (Pittard, William) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-02-13 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-02-13 | 3 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-02-13 | 4 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ACCOUNTABLE. US (Pittard, William) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-02-13 | 5 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ACCOUNTABLE. US. (Attachments: # 1 Summons as to U.S. Attorney General)(Pittard, William) (Entered: 02/13/2020) |
2020-02-14 | 6 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (eg) (Entered: 02/14/2020) |
2020-02-24 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/14/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/15/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Pittard, William) (Entered: 02/24/2020) |
2020-02-24 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 2/28/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/18/2020. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document). (eg) (Entered: 03/03/2020) |
2020-03-16 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/16/2020) |
2020-03-16 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/16/2020) |
2020-03-18 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 1, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 18, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/1/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-03-18 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Norman Anderson on behalf of ACCOUNTABLE.US (Anderson, Norman) (Main Document 11 replaced on 3/19/2020) (zeg). (Entered: 03/18/2020) |
2020-04-01 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2020) |
2020-04-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 1, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 7, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/07/2020) |
2020-04-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/1/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 04/08/2020) |
2020-05-01 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ACCOUNTABLE.US. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Anderson, Norman) (Entered: 05/01/2020) |
2020-05-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 1, 2020. The parties shall also meet and confer before filing the joint status report in an effort to narrow their disputes. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 4, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 05/04/2020) |
2020-06-01 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ACCOUNTABLE.US. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Norman) (Entered: 06/01/2020) |
2020-06-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 14, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 2, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 06/02/2020) |
2020-07-14 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ACCOUNTABLE.US. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Norman) (Entered: 07/14/2020) |
2020-07-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 13, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 14, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 07/14/2020) |
2020-07-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/13/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 07/15/2020) |
2020-08-13 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ACCOUNTABLE.US. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Norman) (Entered: 08/13/2020) |
2020-08-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 15, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 17, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 08/17/2020) |
2020-08-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/15/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 08/17/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ACCOUNTABLE.US. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Norman) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer to determine whether they can narrow the issues in dispute, and the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 6, 2020. In addition, if the parties are unable to resolve their differences and briefing is necessary, the defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment, including any Vaughn index, on or before October 20, 2020; the plaintiff shall file any opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before November 3, 2020; the defendant shall file any reply and any opposition on or before November 17, 2020; and the plaintiff shall file any reply on or before November 24, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on September 16, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-09-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/3/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 11/17/2020. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/24/2020. Status Report due by 10/6/2020 Summary Judgment motions due by 10/20/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/3/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/17/2020. (zjch) (Entered: 09/17/2020) |
2020-10-06 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ACCOUNTABLE.US. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Anderson, Norman) (Entered: 10/06/2020) |
2020-10-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the deadlines in the Court's September 16, 2020 Minute Order are VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before November 6, 2020; the plaintiff shall file any opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before November 20, 2020; the defendant shall file any reply and any opposition on or before December 4, 2020; and the plaintiff shall file any reply on or before December 11, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 7, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/07/2020) |
2020-10-30 | 19 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2020) |
2020-10-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before December 7, 2020; the plaintiff shall file any opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before December 21, 2020; the defendant shall file any reply and any opposition on or before January 4, 2021; and the plaintiff shall file any reply on or before January 11, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 30, 2020. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/30/2020) |
2020-10-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 12/21/2020. Response to Cross Motions due by 1/4/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/11/2021. Summary Judgment motions due by 12/7/2020. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2020. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/4/2021. (zjch) (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2020-12-01 | 20 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2020) |
2020-12-01 | | VACATED PURSUANT OT ORDER FILED 1/20/2021.....MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: the defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before January 21, 2021; the plaintiff shall file any opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before February 4, 2021; the defendant shall file any reply and any opposition on or before February 18, 2021; and the plaintiff shall file any reply on or before February 25, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 1, 2020. (lcdlf1) Modified on 1/21/2021 (zjch, ). (Entered: 12/01/2020) |
2020-12-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 1/21/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/18/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/25/2021. (zjch) (Entered: 12/02/2020) |
2021-01-19 | 21 | Joint MOTION to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2021) |
2021-01-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Motion to Vacate Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadlines set forth in the Court's December 1, 2020 Minute Order are VACATED. And it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before February 19, 2021, if a stipulation of dismissal is not filed before then. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 20, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/20/2021) |
2021-02-19 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/19/2021) |
2021-02-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, if a stipulation of dismissal is not filed before then. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 19, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/19/2021) |
2021-03-09 | 23 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
2021-03-09 | | MINUTE ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice in light of the parties' 23 Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 9, 2021. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |