Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-03-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT under FOIA against EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6956531) filed by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit 2 FOIA receipt, # 4 Summons to EOIR, # 5 Summons to USAG, # 6 Summons to US Atty)(Messer, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/25/2020) |
2020-03-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-03-26 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-04-17 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/17/2020) |
2020-05-06 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/06/2020) |
2020-05-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, and the associated difficulties that it is causing in workplaces, this Court is extending the standard period of time that it affords parties to submit a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment following submission of an answer in a FOIA case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 6/3/2020, the parties shall confer and submit a proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing. This Court will freely grant extensions of this deadline should the need arise. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/6/2020. (jag) (Entered: 05/06/2020) |
2020-06-03 | 5 | STATUS REPORT by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/03/2020) |
2020-06-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the governments 5 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 8/12/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/10/2020. (jag) (Entered: 06/10/2020) |
2020-07-17 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Ilana Kramer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kramer, Ilana) (Entered: 07/17/2020) |
2020-07-18 | 7 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW Substituting for attorney Marsha W. Yee (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/18/2020) |
2020-08-12 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 08/12/2020) |
2020-08-25 | | MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposed briefing schedule for summary judgment: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be served on or before 9/8/2020; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be served on or before 10/8/2020; Defendant's Reply and Cross-Motion Opposition shall be served on or before 11/9/2020; Plaintiff's Cross-Motion Reply shall be served on or before 12/9/2020; briefs shall be filed as a batch within three (3) business days of the service of the last reply brief authorized by this Minute Order, but in any event no later than the Final Filing Deadline of 1/13/2021. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 8/25/2020. (jag) (Entered: 08/25/2020) |
2020-09-08 | 9 | NOTICE of Service of Dispositive Motion by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/08/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 10 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA (Kramer, Ilana) Modified on 10/9/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 11 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ivan Yacub, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Ivan Yacub, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Affidavit of Ivan Yacub, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Affidavit of Ivan Yacub, # 5 Affidavit Affidavit of Carlos Ventura, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Kramer, Ilana) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/9/2020) (zjf). (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 12 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA (Kramer, Ilana) Modified on 10/9/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 13 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA (Kramer, Ilana) Modified on 10/9/2020 (zjf). Modified on 10/9/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 14 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Service by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA (Kramer, Ilana) Modified on 10/9/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 15 | RESPONSE (OPPOSITION) re 9 NOTICE of Service of Dispositive Motion filed by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (See Docket Entry 11 to view document) (zjf) (Entered: 10/09/2020) |
2020-10-09 | 16 | GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/9/2020. (jag) (Entered: 10/09/2020) |
2020-10-09 | | MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Briefs are to be served on service days and batched filed once briefing is complete. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/9/2020. (jag) (Entered: 10/09/2020) |
2020-11-02 | 17 | NOTICE of Waiver of Oral Argument by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA (Kramer, Ilana) (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2020-11-09 | 18 | NOTICE of Service of Defendant's Reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Second Declaration of Crystal Souza, # 4 Exhibit A-D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-12-09 | 19 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment Reply filed by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deleted Files at EOIR, # 2 Exhibit EOIR Recordkeeping)(Kramer, Ilana) Modified on 12/10/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2020-12-09 | 20 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response filed by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (Kramer, Ilana) Modified on 12/10/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2020-12-09 | 21 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment Proposed Order filed by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (Kramer, Ilana) Modified on 12/10/2020 (zjf). (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2020-12-10 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. re 20 Reply to opposition to Motion, 21 Reply to opposition to Motion, 19 Reply to opposition to Motion, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleadings as one entry. (zjf) (Entered: 12/10/2020) |
2020-12-11 | 22 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Cynthia Long, # 4 Declaration Crystal Souza, # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/11/2020) |
2020-12-11 | 23 | RESPONSE re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Opposition and cross motion filed by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Opposition and Cross motion, # 2 Statement of Facts statement of material facts, # 3 Declaration IY Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex A, # 5 Exhibit Ex B, # 6 Exhibit Ex C, # 7 Declaration CAV declaration, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kramer, Ilana) (Entered: 12/11/2020) |
2020-12-11 | 24 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Second Declaration - Crystal Souza, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/11/2020) |
2020-12-11 | 25 | Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Second Crystal Souza, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) Modified link on 12/14/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 12/11/2020) |
2020-12-11 | 26 | REPLY to opposition re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deleted Files at EOIR, # 2 Exhibit EOIR Recordkeeping, # 3 Statement of Facts Response, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kramer, Ilana) Modified link on 12/14/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 12/11/2020) |
2020-12-11 | 27 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARLOS ARTURO VENTURA. (See Docket Entry 23 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2021-06-29 | | Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been elevated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit. She is therefore no longer assigned to this case, and this matter has been reassigned to the Calendar Committee, which will oversee it until it is assigned to another district judge. Any questions should be directed to Judge Jackson's former deputy clerk, Gwendolyn Franklin, at 202-354-3145 or gwen_franklin@dcd.uscourts.gov. (rj) (Entered: 06/29/2021) |
2021-11-15 | | Case directly reassigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been appointed to the D.C. Circuit and is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 11/15/2021) |
2021-12-01 | 28 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kathleene Molen (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 12/01/2021) |
2021-12-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: This case was recently reassigned to the undersigned judge. The Court directs the Parties to appear for a Status Conference on January 20, 2022 at 11:30 AM. The conference will be on the record and conducted via telephone. The Court's Deputy Clerk will provide the information necessary to access the call. The purpose of the conference is to apprise the Court of the status of this matter; the Parties do not need to be prepared to argue any pending motions. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on December 14, 2021. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 12/14/2021) |
2022-01-20 | | Minute Entry for Telephone Status Conference before Judge Jia M. Cobb held on 1/20/2022. Scheduling order forthcoming via Chambers. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (zgdf) (Entered: 01/20/2022) |
2022-01-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS the Defendant to submit a Status Report by February 21, 2022, to provide the Court with an answer as to whether the Defendant will provide or reissue a Notice to Appear to the Plaintiff that would reopen the Plaintiff's proceedings. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 20, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 01/20/2022) |
2022-02-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: On January 20, 2022, the Court ordered the Defendant to submit a Status Report by February 21, 2022, providing the Court with an answer to whether the Defendant will provide or reissue a Notice to Appear to the Plaintiff that would reopen the Plaintiff's proceedings. As of February 25, 2022, the report has not been filed. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS the Parties to appear for a Status Conference on March 3, 2022, at 11:00 via teleconference. The Courtroom Deputy will provide the teleconference information. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 25, 2022.(lcjmc3) (Entered: 02/25/2022) |
2022-02-25 | 29 | STATUS REPORT nunc pro tunc by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2022) |
2022-02-25 | | MINTUE ORDER re 29 Status Report by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW: The Court has reviewed the Status Report and hereby vacates the scheduled status conference on March 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 25, 2022.(lcjmc3) (Entered: 02/25/2022) |
2022-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs the Parties to appear for a status conference on April 1, 2022, at 11:30 AM via Zoom before Judge Cobb. The Courtroom Deputy will send out the Zoom information. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 22, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 03/22/2022) |
2022-03-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby vacates the status conference on April 1, 2022, at 11:30 AM and directs the Parties to appear for a status conference on April 6, 2022, at 11:00 AM via Zoom. The Courtroom Deputy will send out the Zoom information. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 31, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 03/31/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 30 | STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Parties' 30 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, the status conference set for April 6, 2022, at 11 AM is hereby vacated. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 6, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 04/06/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |