Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-08-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7515065) filed by TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT, INSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit TCRP Request to ICE, # 2 Exhibit TCRP Request to DHS, # 3 Exhibit ICAP Request to CBP, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons CBP Summons, # 6 Summons DHS Summons, # 7 Summons ICE Summons, # 8 Summons AG Summons, # 9 Summons USAO Summons)(Friedman, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2020) |
2020-08-27 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) (Entered: 08/27/2020) |
2020-08-27 | 2 | SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 08/27/2020) |
2020-10-08 | 3 | ANSWER to Complaint by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 10/08/2020) |
2020-10-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report by November 4, 2020 . The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiffs requests and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiffs requests can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 14, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/14/2020) |
2020-10-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/4/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 10/14/2020) |
2020-11-04 | 4 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/04/2020) |
2020-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 4 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 18, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 11/18/2020) |
2020-11-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 11/18/2020) |
2020-12-09 | 5 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Duffey on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney kristin brudy-everett (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/09/2020) |
2021-01-04 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/04/2021) |
2021-01-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by March 4, 2021 . It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall appear for a telephonic status conference on January 13, 2021 at 2:00 PM . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 5, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-01-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/4/2021. Status Conference set for 1/13/2021 at 02:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcal) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-01-13 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Carl J. Nichols: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/13/2021. Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2021. Court Reporter: Lorraine Herman. (zcal) (Entered: 01/13/2021) |
2021-01-20 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2021) |
2021-03-04 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/04/2021) |
2021-03-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by May 4, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 11, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 03/11/2021) |
2021-03-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 03/16/2021) |
2021-04-15 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Mary B. McCord on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McCord, Mary) (Entered: 04/15/2021) |
2021-04-19 | 10 | MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by INSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION, TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2021) |
2021-04-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of Robert D. Friedman's 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Mr. Friedman's Motion and accompanying certificate of service satisfy the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.6(c). Moreover, as Mary B. McCord has entered an appearance and will continue to represent Plaintiffs, Mr. Friedman's departure will not unduly delay trial, prejudice either party, or otherwise undermine the interests of justice in this matter. See LCvR 83.6(d). Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 20, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/20/2021) |
2021-05-04 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 6, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 10, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 05/10/2021) |
2021-05-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 05/10/2021) |
2021-07-06 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Safstrom on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Safstrom, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/06/2021) |
2021-07-06 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/06/2021) |
2021-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file another Joint Status Report by September 7, 2021 , and every 60 days thereafter until this matter is resolved. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 8, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 07/08/2021) |
2021-07-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 07/08/2021) |
2021-09-07 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/07/2021) |
2021-11-08 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2021) |
2022-01-10 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2022) |
2022-03-10 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2022) |
2022-05-10 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 05/10/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-20 | 20 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT . Attorney Jennifer Safstrom terminated. by INSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION, TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Safstrom, Jennifer) Modified docket event/text on 7/25/2022 (zed). (Entered: 07/20/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-10-06 | 22 | NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Cruikshank on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cruikshank, Elizabeth) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/7/2022) (zed). NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Cruikshank on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cruikshank, Elizabeth) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/7/2022) (zed). (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-11-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the motion to withdraw the appearance of Jennifer Safstrom 20 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 30, 2022. (lccjn3) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2023-01-17 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-03-17 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION, TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT. (Cruikshank, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/17/2023) |
2023-03-20 | | RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re 25 Joint STATUS REPORT by INSTITUTE FOR CONSTITUTIONAL ADVOCACY AND PROTECTION, TEXAS CIVIL RIGHTS PROJECT. (Cruikshank, Elizabeth). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 3/27/2023. (zbaj) Modified on 3/24/2023 (zbaj). (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-05-16 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-07-18 | 27 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |