Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-11-30 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-15251900.). Filed byUS Right to Know. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | 2 | Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | 3 | Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | 4 | Proposed Summons. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | 5 | Statement (Corporate Disclosure) by US Right to Know. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | 6 | Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/14/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | 7 | Summons Issued as to United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons of US Attorney General, # 2 Summons of US Attorney)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-11-30 | 8 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020) |
2020-12-10 | 9 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by US Right to Know.. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/10/2020) (Entered: 12/10/2020) |
2020-12-17 | 10 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by US Right to Know (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2020-12-17 | | Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used for Summons Returned Executed. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 10 Certificate of Service filed by US Right to Know (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2020-12-18 | 11 | SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by US Right to Know. All Defendants. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020) |
2020-12-30 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Laurel H. Lum (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2020-12-30 | 13 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020) |
2021-01-04 | 14 | CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 1/19/2021. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021) (Entered: 01/04/2021) |
2021-01-04 | 15 | ORDER, signed 1/4/2021, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 13 Stipulation RE: Extension of Time to Answer. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2021) (Entered: 01/04/2021) |
2021-01-08 | 16 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Department of State.. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021) |
2021-01-15 | 17 | Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 1/15/2021) (Entered: 01/15/2021) |
2021-02-11 | 18 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021) |
2021-02-11 | 19 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attachment A)(Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021) |
2021-02-23 | 20 | Certificate of Interested Entities by US Right to Know (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021) |
2021-02-26 | 21 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by US Right to Know. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 2/26/2021) (Entered: 02/26/2021) |
2021-03-01 | 22 | CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021) |
2021-03-01 | 23 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Joint Motion For Entry of Agreed Order Setting Production Schedule filed by US Right to Know. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 3/1/2021) (Entered: 03/01/2021) |
2021-03-03 | 24 | Order. Signed as modified on 3/3/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 23 Stipulation For Entry of Agreed Order Setting Production Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 5/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be by Zoom Webinar. Zoom Webinar Link can be found on Judge Speros web page or the parties may join the Zoom Webinar by using the following Zoom Webinar ID: 161 926 0804. Passcode: 050855. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2021) (Entered: 03/03/2021) |
2021-04-08 | 25 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15811997.) filed by US Right to Know. (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021) |
2021-04-08 | 26 | Order. Signed 4/8/2021 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 25 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Snyder.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021) |
2021-05-25 | 27 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Joint Motion to Continue Case Management Conference Presently Set for June 4, 2021 filed by US Right to Know. (Beaton, Laura) (Filed on 5/25/2021) (Entered: 05/25/2021) |
2021-05-25 | 28 | ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/25/2021 GRANTING re 27 Case Management Statement/Joint Motion to Continue Case Mgmt Conference filed by US Right to Know. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - To be determined. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar and could be subject to change. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebr oadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/z oom/ . (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2021) (Entered: 05/25/2021) |
2021-07-27 | 29 | STATUS REPORT (Joint) by United States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 7/27/2021) (Entered: 07/27/2021) |
2021-10-28 | 30 | STATUS REPORT & JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 22, 2022 by US Right to Know. (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021) |
2021-10-28 | 31 | ORDER. Signed as modified by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/28/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. No further continuances will be granted. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2022. Status Report due b y 1/28/2022 (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021) |
2022-01-28 | 32 | STATUS REPORT (Joint) by United States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022) |
2022-03-15 | 33 | CLERKS REMINDER NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Mgmt Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 2:00 PM will be by Zoom video. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconf erence are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022) |
2022-03-17 | 34 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by US Right to Know. (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 3/17/2022) (Entered: 03/17/2022) |
2022-03-28 | 35 | Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/25/2022. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court p roceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Snyder. Defendant Attorney: Laurel Lum. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/28/2022) (Entered: 03/28/2022) |
2022-04-18 | 36 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 4/18/2022) (Entered: 04/18/2022) |
2022-04-18 | 37 | AFFIDAVIT re 36 Joint Case Management Statement Regarding Defendant's Proposed Processing Rate by United States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 4/18/2022) (Entered: 04/18/2022) |
2022-04-22 | 38 | Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2022. Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2022. Status Conference re: Production of Documents set for 10/21/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that phot ographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: h ttps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Digital Recording Time: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Daniel Snyder. Defendant Attorney: Laurel Lum. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2022) (Entered: 04/22/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 39 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 10/12/2022) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-10-12 | 40 | CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference re: Production of Documents, set for 10/21/2022, is continued to 4/21/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at ht tps://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2022) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2022-11-21 | 41 | MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by US Right to Know. (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2022-11-21 | 42 | Order. Signed 11/21/2022 by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 41 Motion to Substitute Attorney..(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2023-02-17 | 43 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Marisak Lynch (Lynch, Christopher) (Filed on 2/17/2023) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 44 | STATUS REPORT and Request to Continue Status Conference (Joint) by United States Department of State. (Lynch, Christopher) (Filed on 4/12/2023) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-13 | 45 | CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Status Report due by 9/15/2023. Status Conference set for 4/21/2023 is continued to 9/22/2023 02:00 PM PDT in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2023) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
2023-07-24 | 46 | NOTICE by US Right to Know of Unavailability of Counsel (Snyder, Daniel) (Filed on 7/24/2023) (Entered: 07/24/2023) |
2023-09-14 | 47 | STATUS REPORT and Request to Continue Status Conference (JOINT) by United States Department of State. (Lynch, Christopher) (Filed on 9/14/2023) (Entered: 09/14/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 48 | CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Status Conference set for 9/22/2023 is continued to 12/1/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Status Report due by 11/24/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2023) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-11-21 | 49 | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Department of State. (Lum, Laurel) (Filed on 11/21/2023) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-28 | 50 | CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Status Report due by 4/5/2024. Status Conference set for 12/1/2023 is continued to 4/12/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2023) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |