Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-12-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8898760) filed by DOCUMENTED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to USAO DC, # 3 Summons to USAG, # 4 Summons to DHS)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/01/2021) |
2021-12-02 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg) (Entered: 12/02/2021) |
2021-12-02 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 12/02/2021) |
2022-01-07 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/07/2022) |
2022-01-07 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/07/2022) |
2022-01-07 | 5 | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall meet and confer and file a joint report with a proposed schedule within 15 days of this date. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/7/2022. (lcrcl2) Modified on 1/10/2022 (lsj). (Entered: 01/07/2022) |
2022-01-21 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-01-24 | | MINUTE ORDER Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/24/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/24/2022) |
2022-03-22 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 03/22/2022) |
2022-04-01 | | MINUTE ORDER Status Report due by 6/30/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/1/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/01/2022) |
2022-06-30 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 06/30/2022) |
2022-07-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Parties' 8 request to defer setting a briefing schedule is GRANTED. Parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report by 8/26/2022. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/6/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/06/2022) |
2022-08-26 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/26/2022) |
2022-09-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file their next joint status report by 9/26/2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/12/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-23 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 09/23/2022) |
2022-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next joint status report by 11/22/2022. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/26/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 09/26/2022) |
2022-11-22 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
2022-11-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next joint status report by 1/23/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/29/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2023-01-23 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next joint status report by 2/22/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/25/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Status Report by 3/24/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/22/23. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-03-24 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Status Report by 5/23/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/30/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 03/30/2023) |
2023-03-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/23/2023. (zsmc) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-05-23 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/23/2023) |
2023-05-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Status Report by 8/21/23. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/25/23. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/26/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit their next joint status report by 11/20/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/22/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-11-20 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-21 | 18 | ORDER setting summary judgment briefing schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/20/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2024-01-24 | 19 | NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/24/2024) |
2024-01-24 | 20 | Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/24/2024) |
2024-01-24 | 21 | ORDER granting Motion 20 to Modify Briefing Schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/24/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/24/2024) |
2024-02-07 | 22 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Vaughn Index, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/07/2024) |
2024-03-08 | 23 | Memorandum in opposition to re 22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DOCUMENTED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Nicaragua TPS Memo, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Honduras TPS Memo, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Duke's Honduras Memo, # 4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Haiti TPS Memo, # 5 Exhibit Ex 5 - MPP Memo, # 6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Somalia TPS Memo, # 7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Likely Unredacted Haiti TPS Memo, # 8 Statement of Facts, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
2024-03-08 | 24 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by DOCUMENTED. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Nicaragua TPS Memo, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Honduras TPS Memo, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Duke's Honduras Memo, # 4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Haiti TPS Memo, # 5 Exhibit Ex 5 - MPP Memo, # 6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Somalia TPS Memo, # 7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Likely Unredacted Haiti TPS Memo, # 8 Statement of Facts, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
2024-03-14 | 25 | Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/14/2024) |
2024-03-14 | 26 | ORDER granting Motion 25 to Modify Briefing Schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/14/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 03/14/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |