Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-03-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9092760) filed by SPARACINO PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to United States Air Forces Central, # 3 Summons to United States Attorney General, # 4 Summons to Civil Process Clerk - United States Attorney's Office, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 4)(Gottlieb, Michael) Modified on 3/11/2022 To add filing fee information (zmh). (Entered: 03/09/2022) |
2022-03-09 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPARACINO PLLC (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 03/09/2022) |
2022-03-11 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmh) (Entered: 03/11/2022) |
2022-03-11 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2022) (znmw). (Entered: 03/11/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL served on 3/21/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/22/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas M.H. Reddick on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Reddick, Nicholas) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Devin Charles Ringger on behalf of SPARACINO PLLC (Ringger, Devin) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-22 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 04/22/2022) |
2022-04-22 | 10 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before May 6, 2022. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/22/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/22/2022) |
2022-05-06 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/06/2022) |
2022-05-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by June 29, 2022, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/9/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/09/2022) |
2022-06-29 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 06/29/2022) |
2022-06-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by August 29, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/30/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/30/2022) |
2022-08-29 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/29/2022) |
2022-08-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by September 29, 2022 that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/30/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 08/30/2022) |
2022-09-29 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/29/2022) |
2022-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by October 28, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/30/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-10-28 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
2022-10-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by November 30, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/28/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
2022-11-30 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2022-12-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 30, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/1/2022. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/01/2022) |
2023-01-30 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 1, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/31/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 31, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/3/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-03-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by May 30, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/31/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SPARACINO PLLC. (Reddick, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by July 31, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/31/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-07-31 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 07/31/2023) |
2023-07-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by September 29, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/31/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 07/31/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-09-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by November 28, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/29/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-11-15 | 23 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph F. Carilli, Jr on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Sean Tepe (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2023-11-28 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2023-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by January 26, 2024, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/28/2023. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2024-01-26 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES AIR FORCES CENTRAL. (Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2024) |
2024-01-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by March 26, 2024, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/26/24. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/26/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |