Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-03-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT Against U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number ACASDC-16687968.), filed by E.G.V. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:22-cv-407-JLS-RBB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Anne Peterson)(cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 03/28/2022) |
2022-03-28 | 2 | Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxt)(jrd) (Entered: 03/28/2022) |
2022-03-28 | 3 | SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by E.G.V. re 1 Complaint, Exhibits . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Peterson, Anne) QC mailer sent re: exhibits need to be attached to the complaint when it is filed (tcf). (Entered: 03/28/2022) |
2022-03-28 | 4 | MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Peterson, Anne) (fth). (Entered: 03/28/2022) |
2022-03-28 | 5 | SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 4 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Peterson, Anne) (fth). (Entered: 03/28/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 6 | ORDER granting 4 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym and File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/5/2022. (fth) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-28 | 8 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by E.G.V. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served. (Peterson, Anne) (tcf). (Entered: 04/28/2022) |
2022-04-28 | 9 | SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by E.G.V. re 8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA for CASD AUSA and U.S. Atty. Gen. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Peterson, Anne) (tcf). (Entered: 04/28/2022) |
2022-05-06 | 10 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline)Attorney Caroline Clark Prime added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 05/06/2022) |
2022-05-09 | 11 | ORDER Granting 10 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 6/10/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/9/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 05/09/2022) |
2022-06-07 | 12 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-06-08 | 13 | ORDER Granting 12 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 7/11/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/8/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 06/08/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 14 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 15 | ORDER Granting 14 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 7/11/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-08-01 | 16 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 08/01/2022) |
2022-08-02 | 17 | ORDER Granting 16 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Defendant SHALL FILE its responsive pleading on or before 9/2/2022. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/2/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 08/02/2022) |
2022-09-02 | 18 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (alns). (Entered: 09/02/2022) |
2022-09-16 | 19 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Prime, Caroline) (tcf). (Entered: 09/16/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 20 | ORDER Denying as Moot 18 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Filing Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 9/19/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-20 | 21 | NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are set for 11/16/2022 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks via Zoom videoconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 9/20/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 09/20/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 22 | MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Annie Daher by E.G.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In support of Motion to Withdraw)(Daher, Anne) (tcf). (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 23 | ORDER Granting 22 Application to Withdraw Anne Daher as Counsel of Record for the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/3/2022. (tcf) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-16 | 24 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held. (Plaintiff Attorneys Anne Peterson, Zohaile Kakavand). (Defendant Attorney Caroline C. Prime). The parties shall submit a joint status report by email to efile_brooks@casd.uscourts.gov by January 17, 2023. (no document attached) (cdc) (Entered: 11/16/2022) |
2023-01-09 | 25 | ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 22cv407-JLS-BLM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 1/6/2023.(ave) (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-01-09 | 26 | ORDER Re Joint Status Report - due by 1/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/9/2023.(ave) (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-01-19 | 27 | ORDER Setting Deadline for Parties to File Joint Status Report - Supplemental Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/19/2023.(ave) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-03-16 | 28 | ORDER Setting Deadline for Parties to File Joint Status Report, Supplemental Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 3/16/23.(aas) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 29 | ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 22-cv-407-AGS-BLM. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/21/23.(aas) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-05-22 | 30 | ORDER Setting Deadline for Parties to File Joint Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/22/2023.(jms) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 31 | ORDER Setting Deadline for Parties to File Joint Status Report, Joint Status Report due by 10/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 7/26/23.(aas) (Entered: 07/27/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 32 | ORDER Setting Deadline for Parties to File Joint Status Report, Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/30/2023.(jms) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2024-01-19 | 33 | ORDER Setting Deadline for Parties to File Joint Status Report. Status Report due by 4/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 1/19/2024.(jms) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |