Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-04-15 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9174945) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of State)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/15/2022) |
2022-04-15 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/15/2022) |
2022-04-18 | | Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zsb) (Entered: 04/18/2022) |
2022-04-18 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjf) (Entered: 04/18/2022) |
2022-04-26 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/25/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/25/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/26/2022) |
2022-04-26 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/25/22. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/26/2022) |
2022-04-26 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 4/25/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/26/2022) |
2022-05-25 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Newman, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022) |
2022-05-25 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Newman, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/25/2022) |
2022-05-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by June 14, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on May 31, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 05/31/2022) |
2022-06-14 | 9 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Newman, Jeremy) Modified event title on 6/15/2022 (znmw). (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-06-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Judge has reviewed 9 Joint Proposed Schedule and directs the Parties to file a joint status report on September 16, 2022. The Parties are further ordered to file joint status reports every 90 days thereafter until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on June 17, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 06/17/2022) |
2022-09-16 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Newman, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/16/2022) |
2022-12-15 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Newman, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2023-03-15 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Newman, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 13 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |