Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-08-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9430757) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA EPA-2022-002747, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons - EPA)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 08/09/2022) |
2022-08-10 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-22 | 3 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/22/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/22/2022) |
2022-09-02 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 09/02/2022) |
2022-09-06 | 5 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-09-07 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the 5 Motion for Extension of Time. The Government's responsive pleading is now due on or before September 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/7/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-09-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's responsive pleading due by 9/30/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-09-30 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before October 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/30/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/30/2022) |
2022-10-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/21/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 10/04/2022) |
2022-10-20 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-10-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by January 19, 2023, detailing the status of the Government's productions, and whether a Vaughn Index and summary judgment briefing will be necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/20/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-10-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2023-01-19 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-01-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by March 20, 2023, detailing the status of the Government's productions, and whether a Vaughn Index and summary judgment briefing will be necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/20/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by May 19, 2023, detailing the status of the Government's productions, and whether a Vaughn Index and summary judgment briefing will be necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/20/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 03/21/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by July 19, 2023, detailing the status of the Government's productions, and whether a Vaughn Index and summary judgment briefing will be necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/22/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/19/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 11 | NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 12 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-19 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 07/19/2023) |
2023-07-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by September 19, 2023, which must include a briefing schedule, unless the parties file a stipulation of dismissal before then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/19/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/19/2023) |
2023-07-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/19/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 07/20/2023) |
2023-09-19 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 09/19/2023) |
2023-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to appear for a status hearing on October 10, 2023, at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 2 before Judge McFadden. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 09/26/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 15 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/03/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' 15 Stipulation of Dismissal, and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the Court ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/04/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |