Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-08-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9452006) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-18 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 08/18/2022) |
2022-08-23 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmrl) (Entered: 08/23/2022) |
2022-08-23 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 08/23/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-14 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/23/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/22/2022.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/29/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/29/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 09/14/2022) |
2022-09-14 | 6 | ERRATA re 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) Modified to add docket relationship on 9/14/2022 (zed). (Entered: 09/14/2022) |
2022-09-22 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/22/2022) |
2022-09-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond on or before October 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/22/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/22/2022) |
2022-10-07 | 8 | MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-10-28 | 9 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 10/28/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |