Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-09-09 | 1 | CIVIL Cover Sheet (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19981347) filed by Mark A. Gyetvay. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons Department of Justice, # 2 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)(Mueller, Matthew) Modified on 9/13/2022 to reflect Civil Cover Sheet filed and not Complaint (SEH). (Entered: 09/09/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 2 | COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against The United States Department of Justice filed by Mark A. Gyetvay. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Department of Justice, # 3 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney's Office)(Mueller, Matthew) Modified on 9/13/2022 to edit docket text to reflect pleading title (SEH). (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 3 | NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-0571-JLB-KCD. (SJB) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-13 | 4 | SUMMONS issued as to Mark A. Gyetvay. (SEH) (Entered: 09/13/2022) |
2022-09-13 | 5 | SUMMONS issued as to Mark A. Gyetvay. (SEH) (Entered: 09/13/2022) |
2022-10-13 | 6 | RETURN of service executed on 9/26/22 by Mark A. Gyetvay as to United States of America/US Attorney (Mueller, Matthew) Modified on 10/14/2022 to edit docket text (LMW). (Entered: 10/13/2022) |
2022-11-14 | 7 | ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint, by The United States Department of Justice.(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-11-15 | 8 | NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2023 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Case Management Report due by 12/27/2022.(CGW) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
2022-12-15 | 9 | NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The United States Department of Justice. Related case(s): Yes (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 10 | CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by The United States Department of Justice. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 11 | CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mark A. Gyetvay. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 12 | MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion to Conduct Preliminary Pretrial Conference Remotely on January 3, 2023 by The United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Kieran) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 13 | ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Motion for Remote Proceeding. Given Defendant's motion is unopposed, and the Court otherwise finding good cause, the preliminary pretrial conference will be re-noticed as a Zoom proceeding. Further instructions to counsel will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 12/23/2022. (Dudek, Kyle) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 14 | NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 1/3/2023 at 9:00 AM is rescheduled to take place via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Zoom instructions will be sent via separate email to counsel of record.(CGW) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 15 | CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2023-01-03 | 16 | ORAL MOTION for Extension of Time to File designation of lead counsel. (CGW) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-03 | 17 | Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek: granting 16 ORAL Motion for Extension of Time to File designation of lead counsel until 1/10/2023; PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/3/2023. (Digital) (CGW) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-03 | 18 | FOIA CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2023; Dispositive motions due by 12/7/2023; Conduct mediation hearing by 11/9/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/3/2023. (CGW) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-03 | 20 | NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of The United States Department of Justice. Lead Counsel: Kieran O. Carter. (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-04 | 21 | NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew J. Mueller on behalf of Mark A. Gyetvay. Lead Counsel: Matthew J. Mueller. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-09-25 | 22 | MOTION to Amend 18 Case Management Scheduling Order by The United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Carmen Banerjee and Exhibits)(Carter, Kieran) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 23 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Amend 18 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Mark A. Gyetvay. (Mueller, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 24 | ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. An amended FOIA case management and scheduling order will enter separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 10/25/2023. (CGW) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-26 | 25 | AMENDED FOIA CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for court deadlines and directives. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 10/26/2023. (AEH) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |