Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-10-03 | 1 | COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34088479 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff JIAJIE CHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Attorney Grant Y Chien added to party JIAJIE CHEN(pty:bkmov))(Chien, Grant) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant JIAJIE CHEN. (Chien, Grant) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 3 | CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JIAJIE CHEN, (Chien, Grant) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 4 | CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant DNA MOTOR INC. (Chien, Grant) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-03 | 5 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiffs JIAJIE CHEN, DNA MOTOR INC., MAGGIE X LIANG. (Chien, Grant) (Entered: 10/03/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 6 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 7 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 8 | Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 9 | 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (et) (Entered: 10/05/2022) |
2022-10-05 | 10 | STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2023-01-09 | 11 | MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before January 16, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco) (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-01-10 | 12 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Jiajie Chen, DNA Motor Inc., Maggie X. Liang. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Chien, Grant) (Entered: 01/10/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |