Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-10-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9581291) filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to BLM, # 3 Summons to USAO-DC, # 4 Summons to USAG, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14, # 19 Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit 16, # 21 Exhibit 17, # 22 Exhibit 18, # 23 Exhibit 19, # 24 Exhibit 20, # 25 Exhibit 21, # 26 Exhibit 22, # 27 Exhibit 23, # 28 Exhibit 24, # 29 Exhibit 25, # 30 Exhibit 26, # 31 Exhibit 27)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 10/06/2022) |
2022-10-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmrl) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-10-07 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/17/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/16/2022. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 10/17/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2022. (See Docket Entry 3 to view document) (ztth) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
2022-11-15 | 5 | GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 15, 2022. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/15/2022) |
2022-11-16 | 6 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 11/16/2022) |
2022-11-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before December 16, 2022, the defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 17, 2022. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/17/2022) |
2022-11-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response To The Complaint due by 12/16/2022. (mac) (Entered: 11/17/2022) |
2022-12-16 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 12/16/2022) |
2022-12-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 15, 2023, the defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 19, 2022. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 12/19/2022) |
2022-12-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response To The Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/15/2023. (mac) (Entered: 12/19/2022) |
2023-01-14 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/14/2023) |
2023-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 20, 2023, the defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 17, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-01-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response To The Plaintiff's Complaint due by 1/20/2023. (mac) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 9 | MOTION to Dismiss by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 10 | Memorandum in opposition to re 9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-02-07 | 11 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-08-25 | 12 | ORDER. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 25, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 08/25/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 13 | Consent MOTION to Hold in Abeyance re 12 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Set/Reset Deadlines, 1 Complaint,,, , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 12 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Set/Reset Deadlines, 1 Complaint,,, by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 13 Consent Motion (1) for Extension Nunc Pro Tunc and (2) to Hold in Abeyance Defendant's Obligation to Answer the Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 13 Consent Motion (1) for Extension Nunc Pro Tunc and (2) to Hold in Abeyance Defendant's Obligation to Answer the Complaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks an extension nunc pro tunc to respond to the complaint. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that, on or before September 25, 2023, the defendant shall file its Answer to the plaintiff's Complaint. Given that this is the defendant's fourth request for an extension, the Court will grant no further extensions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 15, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-25 | 14 | MOTION for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Set/Reset Deadlines by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-09-25 | 15 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional information before resolving the defendant's 14 Motion for Reconsideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file an opposition to the defendant's motion on or before October 11, 2023, and the defendant shall file a reply in support of its motion on or before October 18, 2023. It is further ORDERED that on October 31, 2023, at 1:00 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a motion hearing, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 26, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 16 | Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Motion for Reconsideration filed by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN. (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-11 | 17 | NOTICE of Proposed Order by AMERICAN WILD HORSE CAMPAIGN re 16 Memorandum in Opposition. (Sorenson, C.); Modified text and docketing event on 10/12/2023 (ztth). (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
2023-10-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before November 13, 2023, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 16, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 18 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 MOTION for Reconsideration re 12 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Set/Reset Deadlines filed by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-31 | | Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2023. Oral arguments heard. The Court denies the defendant's 14 Motion for Reconsideration, for the reasons set forth on the record. (Court Reporter: Tammi Sefranek) (zalh) (Entered: 10/31/2023) |
2023-11-01 | 19 | ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 14 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 1, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2023-11-13 | 20 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order,, Set Deadlines, JOINT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2023-11-14 | 21 | ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before January 29, 2024, the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before February 26, 2024, the plaintiff shall file its combined opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before March 25, 2024, the defendant shall file its combined opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and a reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before April 22, 2024, the plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on July 22, 2024, at 9:00 a.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the parties' summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 14, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2024-01-29 | 22 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Briefing Deadlines by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/29/2024) |
2024-01-31 | 23 | ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' 22 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the parties seek to modify the briefing schedule. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that, on or before April 1, 2024, the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before May 16, 2024, the plaintiff shall file its combined opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before June 13, 2024, the defendant shall file its combined opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and a reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 10, 2024, the plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for July 22, 2024, is CONTINUED to September 23, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the parties' summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 31, 2024. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-02-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/16/2024. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/13/2024. (zalh) (Entered: 02/06/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |
|