Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9802444) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-23 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-24 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/24/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/24/2023) |
2023-02-15 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran O'Neill Carter on behalf of All Defendants (Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 02/15/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 6 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. Case related to Case No. 1:22-cv-3653. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-03-26 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Carter, Kieran) (Entered: 03/26/2023) |
2023-03-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before May 5, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on May 12, 2023, at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/27/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/27/2023) |
2023-04-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of a conflict in the Court's schedule, it is ORDERED that the initial scheduling conference currently scheduled for May 12, 2023 at 3:00 p.m. is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for May 12, 2023 at 4:45 p.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/19/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/19/2023) |
2023-04-26 | | Cases Consolidated. Cases 23-102 and 23-172 have been consolidated with case 22-3653, pursuant to an Order entered 04/26/2023. From this date forward, all pleadings shall be filed ONLY in the lead/earlier case, Civil Action No. 22-3653. (zed) (Entered: 05/02/2023) |
2023-12-04 | 8 | Case directly reassigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich as there is an earlier related case. Judge Randolph D. Moss is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |