Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-20 | 1 | New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (acm) Modified text on 1/23/2023 (acm). (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 2 | COMPLAINT against USA Gov filed by Cheryl Sherry Ann Martin. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (acm) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cheryl Sherry Ann Martin (acm) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | | ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1. Mon Jan 23 10:04:41 CST 2023 (crt) Modified on 1/23/2023 (acm). (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 4 | Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (acm) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | | ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Mon Jan 23 10:28:46 CST 2023 (crt) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 5 | Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (sxf) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | | ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Jan 23 17:34:33 CST 2023 (crt) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 6 | NOTICE of Sharia Law filed by Cheryl Sherry Ann Martin. (axm) (Entered: 01/24/2023) |
2023-01-25 | 7 | Notice that the clerk has been instructed to apply the attached sanction order to the submissions indexed under number: 3:23-cv-156. The sanction order was originally filed in: 3:22-cv-1114 and states: Any cases filed by Plaintiff in which she seeks to proceed in forma pauperis shall be automatically terminated by the clerk of the court pursuant to this order. That order prohibits the filing of a case, so the number assigned to this closed matter remains for indexing purposes only. (rekc) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |