Pistorino v. U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
District
Northern District of California
City
Oakland
Case Number
3:2023cv00380
Date Filed
2023-01-25
Date Closed
Open
Judge
Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
Plaintiff
James Charles Pistorino
Case Description
James Pistorino, an attorney who litigates matters before department, submitted a FOA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning Medicare initial claim approvals or denials for the years 2021-2022. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Pistorino filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees
COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number ACANDC-17929952). Filed by James Charles Pistorino. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit)(Pistorino, James) (Filed on 1/25/2023) Modified on 1/26/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-01-25
2
Proposed Summons. (Pistorino, James) (Filed on 1/25/2023) (Entered: 01/25/2023)
2023-01-26
3
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/9/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2023) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
2023-01-26
4
Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2023) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
2023-01-26
5
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/26/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2023 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2023) (Entered: 01/26/2023)