Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9811494) filed by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 12 Summons U.S. Att'y Gen., # 13 Summons Dep't of Energy, # 14 Summons Dep't of State)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-25 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zljn) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/30/2023 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 1/27/2023 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/30/2023. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-02-01 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/26/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/25/2023. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/13/2023 (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-23 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Upon consideration of the Motion and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendants will answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by March 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 23, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by April 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 20, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-04-03 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-19 | 12 | SCHEDULING ORDER: The Parties shall file a joint status report by May 5, 2023, and every 90 days thereafter until further order of the Court. See document for scheduling order and information concerning case procedures. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 19, 2023. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 04/19/2023) |
2023-05-04 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Lee A. Steven on behalf of AMERICANS FOR PROSPERITY FOUNDATION (Steven, Lee) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-08-03 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 16 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Sean M. Tepe (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-11-01 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2024-01-30 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 01/30/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |