Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9812235) filed by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-25 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR FOOD SAFETY (Stevenson, Meredith) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-25 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrtw) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-25 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-02-09 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 2/1/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/2/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/4/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/02/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit of Receipts Verifying Service)(Stevenson, Meredith) (Entered: 02/09/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-03 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by April 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/3/2023.(lcabj1) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-04-05 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 04/05/2023) |
2023-04-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before May 5, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/6/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 04/06/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 7 joint status report, the parties must file a joint status report on July 17, 2023, with additional status reports as necessary every sixty days, to update the Court on the status of the productions and any remaining issues. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/8/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-07-17 | 8 | STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-07-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 8 joint status report, the parties must file a joint status report on September 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/18/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 07/18/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-18 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 9 joint status report, the parties must file a joint status report by October 30, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/18/2023.(lcabj1) (Entered: 09/18/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 10 | STATUS REPORT (Defendant Only) by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 10 joint status report, the parties must file a joint status report by November 30, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/2/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-30 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
2023-12-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 11 joint status report, the parties must file a joint status report by January 26, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/4/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2024-01-26 | 12 | STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/26/2024) |
2024-01-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 12 joint status report, the parties must file a joint status report by March 26, 2024, if the case has not been resolved in the interim. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/30/2024. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/30/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |