Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9841313) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsl) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-07 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-09 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 9, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 02/09/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are a Complaint and an Answer. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 5, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated dates for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's request and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's request can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 15, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-04-05 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 04/05/2023) |
2023-04-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 6 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the Parties shall file, by May 5, 2023, an additional joint status report, including a proposal for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 10, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 04/10/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 7 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that Defendant shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings by May 22, 2023; Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by June 5, 2023; and Defendant shall file its reply by June 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 12, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-18 | 8 | MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/18/2023) |
2023-06-05 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Neal Cornett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cornett, Eric) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/6/2023) (zed). (Entered: 06/05/2023) |
2023-06-05 | 10 | RESPONSE re 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Response)(Cornett, Eric) (Entered: 06/05/2023) |
2023-06-12 | 11 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 06/12/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 12 | NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-07-25 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Leave to File Amended Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Reply, # 2 Redline of Changes)(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/25/2023) |
2023-07-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 13 Consent Motion for Leave to Amend Reply, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's [13-1] Proposed Amended Reply is deemed FILED. And it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs may submit a surreply as agreed by the Parties pursuant to the Consent Motion. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on July 27, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 07/27/2023) |
2024-03-05 | 14 | ORDER granting 8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on March 5, 2024. (lccjn1) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |