Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18739640). Filed by Center for Gender & Refugee Studies. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) Modified on 10/18/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 2 | Certificate of Interested Entities by American Immigration Council (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 3 | Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Gender & Refugee Studies (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 4 | Proposed Summons. (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 5 | Proposed Summons. (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 6 | Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2023. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 7 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18742504.) filed by American Immigration Council. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-17 | 8 | MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18744184.) filed by American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mathur, Suchita) (Filed on 10/17/2023) (Entered: 10/17/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 9 | Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 10 | Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 11 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 12 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 13 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 14 | Proposed Summons. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/20/2023) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 15 | Proposed Summons. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/20/2023) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-24 | 16 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Attorney)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 17 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Immigration Council, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies.. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/25/2023) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-11-10 | 18 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Immigration Council, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 11/10/2023) (Entered: 11/10/2023) |
2023-11-28 | 19 | NOTICE OF ERRATA re 1 Complaint - CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 1 by American Immigration Council, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies. (Attachments: #(1) CORRECTED Complaint)(Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 11/28/2023) Modified on 11/28/2023 (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2023-11-29 | 20 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Keough (Keough, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2023) (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2023-11-29 | 21 | CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.. (Keough, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2023) (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2023-11-29 | 22 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Date of Defendants' Response to Complaint filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael A. Keough)(Keough, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2023) (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2023-11-30 | 23 | Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 22 Stipulation. (sklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2023) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 24 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Keough, Michael) (Filed on 12/15/2023) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2023-12-19 | 25 | ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 12/19/2023) (Entered: 12/19/2023) |
2023-12-28 | 26 | STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE Joint Stipulation to Continue Date of Initial Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael A. Keough)(Keough, Michael) (Filed on 12/28/2023) (Entered: 12/28/2023) |
2024-01-02 | 27 | Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 26 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2024 continued to 2/12/2024 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2024) (Entered: 01/02/2024) |
2024-02-05 | 28 | JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Keough, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2024) (Entered: 02/05/2024) |
2024-02-08 | 29 | CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2024 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2024) (Entered: 02/08/2024) |
2024-02-12 | 30 | Minute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/12/2024. A partial schedule was set. The Court will issue a Case Management Order. Case referred to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement to be completed by 6/11/2024. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2024 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2024. Digital Recording Time: 1:31-1:33. Attorney for Plaintiff: Raul Pinto. Attorney for Defendant: Michael Keough. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/12/2024) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
2024-02-13 | 31 | CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER (BENCH TRIAL): Close of Fact Discovery is 10/4/2024. Initial Expert Disclosures due by 10/18/2024. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/15/2024. Close of Expert Discovery is 12/6/2024. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2025 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2025 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Bench Trial set for 5/20/2025-5/21/2025 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2024 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 6/17/2024. Signed by Judge Sallie Kim on 2/13/2024. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2024) (Entered: 02/13/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |