Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT for Violation of FOIA-5 U.S.C. 552 against United States Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9653752), filed by The Cincinnati Enquirer, a division of Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Form) (Greiner, John) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 2 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer, a division of Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Greiner, John) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-20 | | If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2023-10-20 | 3 | Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (bjc) (Entered: 10/20/2023) |
2024-02-01 | 4 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Enquirer is ORDERED to show cause, in writing and within twenty-one (21) days, why the complaint should not be dismissed for failure of service. Alternatively, The Enquirer is INSTRUCTED to notify the Court, in writing and within twenty-one (21) days, should it require additional time to cure a failure of service, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i)(4)(A). Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/1/2024. (kkz) (Entered: 02/01/2024) |
2024-02-08 | 5 | MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/8/2024. by Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Darren W. Ford) (Ford, Darren) (Entered: 02/08/2024) |
2024-02-14 | | NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to effectuate service is GRANTED. Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer shall now have up to and including 4/8/24 to perfect service on Defendant United States Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/14/24. (kkz) (Entered: 02/14/2024) |
2024-03-05 | 6 | SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant United States Department of Justice. United States Department of Justice served on 2/23/2024, answer due 4/23/2024. (Ford, Darren) Modified on 3/6/2024 (eh). (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-06 | | Reset Deadlines re doc. 6 : United States Department of Justice answer due 4/23/2024. (eh) (Entered: 03/06/2024) |
2024-03-06 | 7 | Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re 1 Complaint and 3 Summons Issued. (eh) (Entered: 03/06/2024) |
2024-03-07 | 8 | STIPULATION Stipulated Extension of Time, from March 18, 2024 to April 8, 2024, by Defendant United States Department of Justice. (Stark, John) (Entered: 03/07/2024) |
2024-03-08 | | Reset Deadlines: United States Department of Justice answer due 4/8/2024 per Doc. 8 . (bjc) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |