Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36290009 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Peter POPOV. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit) (Attorney Peter Popov added to party Peter POPOV(pty:pla))(Popov, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 2 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Peter POPOV. (Popov, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 3 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Peter POPOV. (Popov, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 4 | Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Peter POPOV. (Popov, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 5 | COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid (402 paid on 10/25/2023, receipt number 36290009), filed by Plaintiff Peter POPOV.(Popov, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-26 | 6 | NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (jtil) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
2023-10-26 | 7 | NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
2023-10-26 | 8 | Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
2023-10-27 | 9 | STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-10-27 | 10 | 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 MGarland, # 2 Civil Processing Clerk) (jtil) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 11 | SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Popov, upon Defendant Department of Homeland Security served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Peter Popov (Popov, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 12 | SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Popov, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Peter Popov (Popov, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 13 | SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Popov, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Peter Popov (Popov, Peter) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-12-08 | 14 | STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Department of Homeland Security answer now due 1/14/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Sarah L Cronin added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft))(Cronin, Sarah) (Entered: 12/08/2023) |
2024-01-08 | 15 | STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 02/20/2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah L. Cronin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cronin, Sarah) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-09 | 16 | ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Pursuant to the Stipulation 15 , IT IS ORDERED that the time for Defendant Department of Homeland Security to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to and including 2/20/2024. (gk) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
2024-02-20 | 17 | NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Department of Homeland Security. Motion set for hearing on 5/17/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, # 2 Declaration of Sarah L. Cronin, # 3 Declaration of Jarrod Panter, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Proposed Judgment) (Cronin, Sarah) (Entered: 02/20/2024) |
2024-02-21 | 18 | ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
2024-03-01 | 19 | STIPULATION for Order to Set Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF17], and to Continue Scheduling Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by Defendant Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah L. Cronin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cronin, Sarah) (Entered: 03/01/2024) |
2024-03-05 | 20 | ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Pursuant to the Stipulation 19 , IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have to and including 3/21/2024, to file an opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment 17 . Defendant shall have to and including 4/12/2024, to file a reply in support of its Motion. The hearing on the Motion is set for 5/17/2024 at 10:00 AM. The Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 6/14/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (gk) (Entered: 03/06/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |