Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-11-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10464599) filed by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed Summons to U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons Proposed Summons to U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Proposed Sumons to USAO for D.C.)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2023-11-01 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT (Strugar, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/3/2023) (mg). (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2023-11-02 | | NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to matthew@matthewstrugar.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Complaint and Summons have separate Defendants. Please update Summons to reflect Complaint, 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zdp, ) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-02 | 3 | ERRATA to Complaint by WHITE COAT WASTE PROJECT re 1 Complaint,. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Caption & first page of Complaint)(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-02 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zdp) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-02 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-13 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/13/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/13/2023. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2023-11-13 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/9/2023. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 11/9/2023 (See docket entry 5 to view document). (mg) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2023-12-14 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 12/14/2023) |
2023-12-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. The 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before January 16, 2024. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 19, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 12/19/2023) |
2024-01-16 | 8 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Substituting for attorney John Moustakas (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
2024-01-16 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |