Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-11-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT under the Freedom of Information Act against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10464776) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (FOIA Request), # 2 Exhibit B (FOIA Response), # 3 Exhibit C (transmission email), # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons to SEC, # 6 Summons to US Attorney General, # 7 Summons to US Attorney)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
2023-11-02 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-02 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zdp) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-02 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 11/02/2023) |
2023-11-14 | 4 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2023-12-18 | 5 | ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 12/18/2023) |
2023-12-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit, on or before January 8, 2024, a proposed briefing schedule (not 16.3 report). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/18/2023. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/18/2023) |
2024-01-08 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 7, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/08/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-02-07 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 02/07/2024) |
2024-02-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/07/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/07/2024) |
2024-03-08 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Cheng, Esther) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
2024-03-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 8, 2024, if the matter is not dismissed before that date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/08/2024. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |