Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-12-10 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Department of Justice. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-28673373)Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/10/2023) |
2023-12-10 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/10/2023) |
2023-12-10 | 3 | RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Penske Media Corporation for Rolling Stone, LLC. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/10/2023) |
2023-12-10 | 4 | FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, US Attorney General, US Attorney for the Southern District of New York, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) Modified on 12/11/2023 (vf). (Entered: 12/10/2023) |
2023-12-11 | | CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-11 | | Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-11 | | Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-11 | | ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kelly Brian McClanahan to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Docket Entry Error. Enter the party name as to whom summons is issued for when prompted in ECF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-11 | 5 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-11 | 6 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-11 | 7 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-12 | 8 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2023-12-12 | 9 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2023-12-12 | 10 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice..(jgo) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2023-12-28 | 11 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. Department of Justice served on 12/22/2023, answer due 1/22/2024. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/28/2023) |
2024-01-16 | 12 | LETTER MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kel McClanahan dated 16 January 2024. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint).(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
2024-01-17 | 13 | ORDER granting 12 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document on the condition that the amended complaint is filed on or before January 19, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis) (Entered: 01/17/2024) |
2024-01-17 | 14 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Marryshow on behalf of Department of Justice..(Marryshow, Danielle) (Entered: 01/17/2024) |
2024-01-17 | 15 | FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Department of Justice.Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC. Related document: 1 Complaint..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 01/17/2024) |
2024-01-31 | 16 | ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Department of Justice..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-02-05 | 17 | NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on February 20, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. as set forth herein. Counsel for Plaintiff is ordered to notify all counsel of this Notice. SO ORDERED.Telephonic Initial Conference set for 2/20/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/05/2024) (ama) (Entered: 02/05/2024) |
2024-02-13 | 18 | JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Dominika Tarczynska dated 2/13/2024 re: Case Management Plan. Document filed by Department of Justice..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 02/13/2024) |
2024-02-14 | 19 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 18 Letter Case Management Plan filed by Department of Justice. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are relieved of the obligation to file a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/14/24) (yv) (Entered: 02/14/2024) |
2024-02-20 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis J. Liman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/20/2024 by Telephone Conference. Kelly McClanahan present by telephone for Plaintiff. Danielle Marryshow and Dominika Tarczynska present by telephone for Defendant. Court reporter present by telephone. Plaintiff to make its motion for partial summary judgment by March 5, 2024. (mf) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-04 | 20 | CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Kel McClanahan dated 4 March 2024. Document filed by Rolling Stone, LLC..(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 03/04/2024) |
2024-03-05 | 21 | ORDER granting 20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (Liman, Lewis) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |