Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2024-01-08 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10604350) filed by WP COMPANY LLC d/b/a The Washington Post. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - request, # 2 Exhibit B - response, # 3 Exhibit C - appeal, # 4 Exhibit D - acknowledgement of appeal, # 5 Summons to Department of Interior, # 6 Summons to Attorney General, # 7 Summons to US Attorney, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-08 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WP COMPANY LLC d/b/a The Washington Post (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-10 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
2024-01-10 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
2024-01-11 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/2024. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 01/11/2024) |
2024-01-16 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/11/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2024. (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
2024-01-17 | 6 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Isabella Salomao Nascimento, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10623231. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WP COMPANY LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Applicant, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 01/17/2024) |
2024-01-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Dkt. 6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Isabella Salomao Nascimento is hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a)/LCrR 44.5(a). Click for Instructions . Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/21/2024. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 01/21/2024) |
2024-01-22 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Isabella Salomao Nascimento on behalf of WP COMPANY LLC. (Salomao Nascimento, Isabella) (Entered: 01/22/2024) |
2024-02-06 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2024) |
2024-02-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion for extension, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this matter on or before February 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/6/2024. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 02/06/2024) |
2024-02-26 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/26/2024) |
2024-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before March 26, 2024, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on April 2, 2024, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/27/2024. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 02/27/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |