Estate of Ashli Babbitt et al v. U.S. Department of Justice
District
Southern District of California
City
San Diego
Case Number
3:2024cv00119
Date Filed
2024-01-17
Date Closed
Open
Judge
Judge Linda Lopez
Plaintiff
Estate of Ashli Babbitt
Plaintiff
Aaron Babbitt individually and on behalf of the estate of Ashli Babbitt
Case Description
The Estate of Ashli Babbitt submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning FBI files on Ashli Babbitt. Aaron Babbitt also submitted a request for his FBI files. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The FBI denied the requests. Aaron Babbitt filed administrative appeals for both requests to the Office of Information Policy. OIP remanded the requests for a search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Estate of Ashli Babbitt filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search
COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18508107.), filed by Estate of Ashli Babbitt, Aaron Babbitt. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) The new case number is 3:24-cv-119-LL-JLB. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Robert Patrick Sticht)(rxc) (sjt). (Entered: 01/18/2024)
2024-01-18
2
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rxc) (sjt). (Entered: 01/18/2024)
2024-02-08
3
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Ashli Babbitt, Aaron Babbitt. U.S. Department of Justice served. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Sticht, Robert) (ddf). (Entered: 02/08/2024)
2024-02-26
4
NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Drew Silverberg on behalf of U.S. Department of Justice (Silverberg, Cameron)Attorney Cameron Drew Silverberg added to party U.S. Department of Justice(pty:dft) (ddf). (Entered: 02/26/2024)
2024-02-28
5
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by U.S. Department of Justice.(Silverberg, Cameron) (ddf). (Entered: 02/28/2024)
2024-03-07
6
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/7/2024.(ddf) (Entered: 03/07/2024)