Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2024-01-19 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10631111) filed by ENERGY AND POLICY INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOC Summons, # 3 Summons AGO Summons, # 4 Summons USAO Summons)(Robbins, Zehava) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-01-19 | 2 | MOTION for Permission to Use Post Office Box by ENERGY AND POLICY INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Use PO Box)(Robbins, Zehava) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-01-19 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENERGY AND POLICY INSTITUTE (Robbins, Zehava) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-01-19 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrtw) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-01-19 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-02-28 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 02/28/2024) |
2024-02-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Permission to Use Post Office Box as Plaintiff's Address. Plaintiff may use a PO Box as its address on its Complaint. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/29/24. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/29/2024) |
2024-02-29 | 6 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before March 13, 2024. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/29/24. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/29/2024) |
2024-03-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2024. (hmc) (Entered: 03/01/2024) |
2024-03-13 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 03/13/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |