Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2024-01-23 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10639699) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12, # 17 Exhibit 13, # 18 Exhibit 14)(Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 01/23/2024) |
2024-01-23 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. Case related to Case No. 23-cv-1854. (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 01/23/2024) |
2024-01-25 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 01/25/2024) |
2024-01-25 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/25/2024) |
2024-01-25 | 4 | STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 25, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/25/2024) |
2024-01-31 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-01-31 | 6 | NOTICE of Objection Under Local Civil Rule 40.5(b)(2) to Plaintiffs' 2 Notice of Designation of Related Civil Cases by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER. The plaintiffs are directed to file a response—not to exceed 5 pages—to the defendant's 6 Objection to Plaintiffs' Related-Case Designation on or before February 7, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 31, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-02-01 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Neal Cornett on behalf of HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL (Cornett, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2024) |
2024-02-07 | 8 | RESPONSE re 6 Notice (Other) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 02/07/2024) |
2024-02-13 | 9 | ORDER regarding the plaintiffs' 2 Notice of Designation of Related Civil Cases. Upon consideration of the parties' submissions, the Court concludes that this case is not related to Heritage Foundation v. U.S. Department of Justice , 23-cv-1854, under Local Rule 40.5(a)(3). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Calendar and Case Management Committee under Local Rule 40.5(c)(1) for further proceedings. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 13, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 02/13/2024) |
2024-02-14 | | Case randomly reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton as the case is not related to an earlier filed case. Judge Dabney L. Friedrich is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 02/14/2024) |
2024-02-26 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 02/26/2024) |
2024-03-08 | 11 | GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 8, 2024. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
2024-03-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 8, 2024, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 8, 2024. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |