Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2010-09-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of State. IFP Filed, filed by Eugene Washington Murphy. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(vt) (Entered: 09/07/2010) |
2010-09-07 | 2 | Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. (vt) (Entered: 09/07/2010) |
2010-09-07 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene Washington Murphy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(vt) (Entered: 09/07/2010) |
2010-09-13 | 4 | ORDER granting in part 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2010. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2010) |
2010-09-13 | 5 | ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2010. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2010) |
2010-09-13 | 6 | Order Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/10/2010. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2010) |
Hide Docket Events |