Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUnited States Sugar Corporation v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityWest Palm Beach
Case Number9:2010cv81081
Date Filed2010-09-10
Date Closed2010-11-16
JudgeJudge William P. Dimitrouleas
PlaintiffUnited States Sugar Corporation
DefendantUnited States Army Corps of Engineers
DefendantLT. General Robert Van Antwerp Chief of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, in his official capacity
DefendantCol. Alfred A. Pantano, Jr. District Commander, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District, in his official capacity
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-09-101COMPLAINT against Col. Alfred A. Pantano, Jr., District Commander, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, Jacksonville District, in his official capacity, Lt. General Robert Van Antwerp, Chief of Engineers, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, in his official capacity, United States Army Corps of Engineers. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3154368, filed by United States Sugar Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) United States Army Corps of Engineers, # 3 Summon(s) Lt. General Robert Van Antwerp, # 4 Summon(s) Col. Alfred A. Pantano, Jr., # 5 Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N, # 19 Exhibit O, # 20 Exhibit P, # 21 Exhibit Q, # 22 Exhibit R, # 23 Exhibit S, # 24 Exhibit T)(Malinoski, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
2010-09-102Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow (gme) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-133Summons Issued as to Alfred A. Pantano, Jr, United States Army Corps of Engineers, Robert Van Antwerp. (gme) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
2010-09-134Order Requiring counsel to meet and file a Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/13/2010. (lk) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar