Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAROLINA SUNROCK LLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictMiddle District of North Carolina
CityNCMD
Case Number1:2010cv00720
Date Filed2010-09-17
Date Closed2011-04-29
JudgeJUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR.
PlaintiffCAROLINA SUNROCK LLC
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-09-171COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0418-819137), filed by CAROLINA SUNROCK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit6)(WOLF, WILLIAM) Modified on 9/20/2010 to edit duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
2010-09-17CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
2010-09-202Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Additional Summons - U.S. Attorney General, # 2 Additional Summons - U.S. Attorney) (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
2010-09-203Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
2010-09-234Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAROLINA SUNROCK LLC identifying Corporate Parent SUNROCK GROUP HOLDINGS CORPORATION for CAROLINA SUNROCK LLC. (WOLF, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
2010-09-295CERTIFICATE re 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement Certificate of Service by Plaintiff CAROLINA SUNROCK LLC. (WOLF, WILLIAM) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
2010-10-066Declaration of Proof of Service served on United States Department of Veterens Affairs on 9/23/2010, filed by CAROLINA SUNROCK LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(WOLF, WILLIAM) Modified on 10/15/2010 to remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
2010-10-06***FILED IN ERROR*** Set Answer Deadline as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS: Answer due 11/23/2010. (Butler, Carol) Modified on 10/14/2010 to reflect entry filed in error. See update answer deadline entered on 10/14/2010. (Butler, Carol). (Entered: 10/07/2010)
2010-10-14Set Answer deadline updated for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS to 10/27/2010. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
2010-10-277ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (BECK, GILL) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
2010-10-288NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 12/16/2010 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
2010-11-029AMENDED DOCUMENT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. Amendment to 7 Answer to Complaint. (BECK, GILL) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
2010-12-0310Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BECK, GILL) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
2010-12-06Motions Referred: 10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD- (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
2010-12-2011ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 12/20/2010 granting 10 RULE 26F (JOINT) Plaintiffs Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2010. Defendants Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2011. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 12/31/2010. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 1/14/2011. A jury trial has not been demanded. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2010-12-20Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2010. Defendant's Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2011. due by 12/31/2010. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
2011-01-2012MOTION for Extension of Time by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BECK, GILL) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
2011-01-21Motions Referred: 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD- (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
2011-01-2113ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 1/21/2011, that Defendant is granted an extension of time within which (1) to complete its searches and complete the release of all remaining records that it has in its possession which are responsive to Plaintiffs Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) requests, (2) to produce those records to the Court, and (3) to submit the Vaughn index and affidavit/declaration, in the above-entitled cause from January 21, 2011 to and including January 31, 2011. Re: 12 Motion for Extension of Time. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
2011-01-3114NOTICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS of Submission of Declaration of Gregory P. Mavraganis and Vaughn Index and Manual Filing of United States Department of Veteran Affairs' Redacted Documents Provided with FOIA Releases 1 through 4 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration with Vaughn Index)(BECK, GILL) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
2011-01-3115NOTICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS of In Camera Submission and Manual Filing of United States Department of Veteran Affairs' Sequentially Numbered Unredacted Documents Provided with FOIA Releases 1 through 4 (BECK, GILL) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
2011-01-31In Camera Documents Received by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRSSequentially Numbered Set of Unredacted Documents Provided with FOIA Releases 1 through 4.(Butler, Carol) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
2011-02-16Case Reassigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. UNASSIGNED no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
2011-02-2216Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BECK, GILL) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
2011-02-23Motions Referred: 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Williamson, Wanda) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
2011-02-2417ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 2/24/2011, that the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Docket Entry 16 ) is granted, and the Parties have (1) to and including March 25, 2011, within which to file (1) cross-motions for summary judgment; (2) to and including April 18, 2011, within which to file responses to cross-motions for summary judgment; and (3) to and including May 2, 2011, within which to file reply briefs. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
2011-03-2118Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(BECK, GILL) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
2011-03-22Motions Referred: 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint) to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Williamson, Wanda) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
2011-03-2219ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 3/22/2011 granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the parties' Second Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Docket Entry 18 ) is granted, and the parties are granted an extension of time within which to file (1) cross-motions for summary judgment until and including April 25, 2011, (2) responses to cross-motions for summary judgment until and including May 18, 2011, and (3) reply briefs until and including June 1, 2011, in the above-entitled cause. Cross Motions for summary judgment due by 4/25/2011. Responses to cross- motions for summary judgment due by 5/18/2011. Replie briefs due by 6/1/2011. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
2011-04-1420STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (BECK, GILL) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
2011-04-2921STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice (Joint) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (BECK, GILL) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar