Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMeier v. McHugh
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2010cv02382
Date Filed2010-08-27
Date Closed2011-07-11
JudgeJudge Peter J. Messitte
PlaintiffMichelle S. Meier
DefendantJohn M. McHugh The Honorable, Secretary of the Army
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-271COMPLAINT against Michelle S. Meier ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 84637016127.), filed by Michelle S. Meier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
2010-09-222ORDER directing the Clerk send copy of this Order and 3 summonses in blank to Plaintiff, who shall compete them and return them to the Clerk; upon receipt the Clerk shall prepare and issue summons to Plaintiff fo that she may effect service of process on Defendant. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/22/2010. (c/m 9/23/2010 (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
2010-09-303Summons Issued 60 days as to John M. McHugh, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
2010-11-014MOTION for Extension of Time by John M. McHugh Responses due by 11/18/2010 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
2010-11-015PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 11/1/10. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
2010-12-026SUMMONS Returned Executed on John M. McHugh served on 10/12/2010, Eric Holder on 10/14/2010 and Rod Rosenstein on 10/5/2010 answer due 12/13/2010. with Attachments (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
2011-01-057MOTION to Dismiss by John M. McHugh Responses due by 1/24/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8)(Barnard, Thomas) Modified on 1/7/2011 (rank, Deputy Clerk).(Hard Copy rec'd 1/7/2011 rk) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
2011-01-068Correspondence re: Rule 12/56 letter to plaintiff. (c/m 1/6/11) (elts, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
2011-01-199MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Michelle S. Meier Responses due by 2/7/2011 (ranks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
2011-01-1910PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 7 Motion to Dismiss (to 3/15/11). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 1/19/11. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
2011-03-1411MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Michelle S. Meier Responses due by 3/31/2011 (ranks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
2011-03-1412PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/14/11. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
2011-05-1613Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Motion to dismiss to and including 7/18/2011 by Michelle S. Meier Responses due by 6/3/2011 (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
2011-05-1714PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 5/17/11. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
2011-07-1115ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 7/8/2011. (c/m 7/11/2011(ranks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar