Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2010-08-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Donald Berwick, Sanne Magnan, Kathleen G. Sebelius ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-47990.) assigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, filed by M. C. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (VEM) (Entered: 08/26/2010) |
2010-08-26 | | Summons Issued as to Donald Berwick, Sanne Magnan, Kathleen G. Sebelius. (VEM) (Entered: 08/26/2010) |
2010-08-30 | 2 | ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 08/30/10. (kll) (Entered: 08/30/2010) |
2010-08-30 | 3 | TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Senior Judge Paul A. Magnuson. Judge Richard H. Kyle no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 10cv3755 PAM/JJK . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME) (Entered: 08/30/2010) |
2010-09-09 | 4 | DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. C.. Donald Berwick served on 8/30/2010, answer due 10/29/2010; Sanne Magnan served on 8/31/2010, answer due 11/1/2010; Kathleen G. Sebelius served on 9/1/2010, answer due 11/1/2010. (Kosieradzki, Mark) Modified on 10/14/2010 (akl). (Entered: 09/09/2010) |
2010-09-22 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by D Gerald Wilhelm on behalf of Kathleen G. Sebelius. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 09/22/2010) |
2010-10-14 | 6 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by M. C.. Donald Berwick served on 10/5/2010, answer due 12/6/2010; Sanne Magnan served on 10/5/2010, answer due 12/6/2010; Kathleen G. Sebelius served on 10/5/2010, answer due 12/6/2010. (Kosieradzki, Mark) (Entered: 10/14/2010) |
2010-11-05 | 7 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by M. C. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 11/05/2010) |
Hide Docket Events |