Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2010-08-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Justice (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T56592) filed by Eric J. Engberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RFK) (Entered: 08/11/2010) |
2010-08-18 | 2 | NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 (TKD) (Entered: 08/18/2010) |
2010-08-26 | 3 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice c/o U.S. Attorney. (RFK) (Entered: 08/26/2010) |
2010-10-15 | 4 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of Justice.(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 10/15/2010) |
2011-01-07 | 5 | **TERMINATED AND IMAGE DELETED; ATTORNEY NOTIFIED TO REDACT** CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Scarberry, Jason) Modified on 1/10/2011 (RFK). (Entered: 01/07/2011) |
2011-01-10 | 6 | CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 01/10/2011) |
2011-02-03 | 7 | Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Change Track Designation by Eric J. Engberg. (Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 02/03/2011) |
2011-02-09 | 8 | ORDER granting 7 --motion to re-designate the case as a TRACK ONE case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/9/2011. (BK) (Entered: 02/09/2011) |
2011-03-01 | 9 | MOTION for summary judgment by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Affidavit Patricia Reiersen Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Reiersen Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 03/01/2011) |
2011-03-02 | 10 | ORDER referring motion to Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo for preparation of a report and recommendation: 9 --motion by the U.S. Department of Justice for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/2/2011. (BK) (Entered: 03/02/2011) |
2011-03-09 | 11 | ORDER setting forth the parties' briefing schedule. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 3/9/2011. (JMF) (Entered: 03/09/2011) |
2011-04-01 | 12 | RESPONSE in opposition re 9 MOTION for summary judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Eric J. Engberg. (Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 04/01/2011) |
2011-04-04 | 13 | MEMORANDUM in opposition re 9 Motion for summary judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (AMENDED) filed by Eric J. Engberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Shackleford Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - Composite, # 3 Exhibit C- Order dated February 11, 2011, # 4 Exhibit D - Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, # 5 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement And Release of Claims, # 6 Exhibit F - Letter from Gardner)(Scarberry, Jason) (Entered: 04/04/2011) |
2011-04-08 | 14 | REPLY to response to motion re 9 MOTION for summary judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Department of Justice. (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 04/08/2011) |
2011-05-10 | 15 | NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Giuffreda on behalf of Eric J. Engberg (Giuffreda, Richard) (Entered: 05/10/2011) |
2011-05-10 | 16 | NOTICE by Eric J. Engberg re 13 Memorandum in opposition of Filing Supplemental Exhibit in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Giuffreda, Richard) (Entered: 05/10/2011) |
2011-05-16 | 17 | NOTICE by U.S. Department of Justice re 9 MOTION for summary judgment (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 05/16/2011) |
2011-05-16 | 18 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. Department of Justice re 17 Notice (Other) (Gardner, Joshua) (Entered: 05/16/2011) |
2011-08-04 | 19 | ORDER directing the Department of Justice to file with the Clerk, on or before August 11, 2011, the Report of Investigation at issue in this matter along with a notice that the document is being filed under seal per this Order for the Court's in camera review. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 8/4/2011. (JMF) (Entered: 08/04/2011) |
2011-08-12 | 21 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 9 MOTION for summary judgment filed by U.S. Department of Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark A. Pizzo on 8/12/2011. (JMF) (Entered: 08/12/2011) |
2011-09-27 | 22 | ORDER adopting 21 --REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting 9 --motion for summary dgment by U.S. Department of Justice; denying 12 --cross-motion for summary judgment; directing the Clerk to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of the defendant and against the plaintiff, to TERMINATE any pending motion, and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/27/2011. (BK) (Entered: 09/27/2011) |
2011-09-28 | 23 | JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Department of Justice against Eric J. Engberg (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LYB) (Entered: 09/28/2011) |
Hide Docket Events |