Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAdvantage, LLC et al v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityBay City
Case Number1:2010cv13182
Date Filed2010-08-11
Date Closed2011-05-03
JudgeDistrict Judge Thomas L. Ludington
PlaintiffAir Advantage, LLC
PlaintiffZimco, Inc
PlaintiffScott Zimmer
PlaintiffDawn Zimmer
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-08-111COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-2585911 - Fee: $ 350. County of 1st Plaintiff: Saginaw - County Where Action Arose: Saginaw - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit Letter, # 4 Exhibit Response and Request Letter, # 5 Exhibit FOIA Production, # 6 Exhibit Appeal with attachments, # 7 Exhibit Appeal Acknowledgment) (Crandall, Martin) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
2010-08-122Notice of Corrected Judicial Assignment due to Clerical Error: Reassigned from * District Judge Arthur J Tarnow* and *Magistrate Judge Mark A Randon* to District Judge Thomas L Ludington and Magistrate Judge Charles E Binder (ATee) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
2010-08-123SUMMONS Issued for *United States Department of Justice* (DWor) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
2010-08-124SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DWor) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
2010-08-12A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DWor) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
2010-09-015Notice of Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge filed by All Plaintiffs. (Crandall, Martin) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
2010-10-156CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Crandall, Martin) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
2010-10-287ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew J. Lievense appearing on behalf of United States Department of Justice (Lievense, Andrew) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
2010-11-038STIPULATION AND ORDER allowing the filing of a First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
2010-11-169AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit Letter, # 4 Exhibit Response and Request Letter, # 5 Exhibit FOIA Production, # 6 Exhibit Appeal, # 7 Exhibit Appeal Acknowledgment, # 8 Exhibit Notice of Closing Appeal) (Crandall, Martin) Modified on 11/16/2010 (NHol). [FILED IN ERROR - PLEASE DISREGARD] (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1610AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit Letter, # 4 Exhibit Response and Request Letter, # 5 Exhibit FOIA Production, # 6 Exhibit Appeal, # 7 Exhibit Appeal Acknowledgment, # 8 Exhibit Notice of Closing of Appeal) (Crandall, Martin) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
2010-11-1811AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit Letter, # 4 Exhibit Response and Request Letter, # 5 Exhibit FOIA Production, # 6 Exhibit Appeal, # 7 Exhibit Appeal Acknowledgment, # 8 Exhibit Notice of Closing of Appeal) (Crandall, Martin) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
2010-12-1612ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by United States Department of Justice. (Lievense, Andrew) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
2011-01-3113NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/10/2011 09:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L Ludington (TJac) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
2011-02-09Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference reset for 2/10/2011 11:30 AM before District Judge Thomas L Ludington (TJac) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
2011-02-10Minute Entry - Scheduling Conference held by telephone on 2/10/2011 before District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (TJac) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
2011-02-1514Stipulated Order for Briefing Schedule. ( Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/31/2011 , Response due by 5/2/2011, Reply due 5/16/2011 ) Signed by District Judge Thomas L Ludington. (SGam) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
2011-03-3015Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States Department of Justice. (Lievense, Andrew) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
2011-03-3116ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SGam) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
2011-03-3117MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sue Ann Slates with exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Vaughn Index) (Lievense, Andrew) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
2011-05-0318STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (TJac) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar