Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBEUKE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2010cv00723
Date Filed2010-05-05
Date Closed2010-05-17
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffMICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2010-05-051COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616029471) filed by MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-05SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-052NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE. Case related to Case No. 2:04CV1156 -- United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio (Eastern Division). (rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-053MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE (Attachments: # 1 65.1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-054MOTION for Emergency Hearing by MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-055MOTION Expedited Ruling by MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
2010-05-066NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Elizabeth Brown Kapp on behalf of MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE (Kapp, Amy) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
2010-05-067NOTICE /Revised Notice Under Local Civil Rule 65.1 by MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE (McDonald, Ashley) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
2010-05-068NOTICE of Appearance by Deanna Lynn Durrett on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Durrett, Deanna) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
2010-05-079ORDER denying 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and denying 4 Plaintiff's Motion for an Emergency Hearing. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/7/2010. (lcrmc2) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
2010-05-1710NOTICE of Dismissal by MICHAEL FRANCIS BEUKE (McDonald, Ashley) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
2010-05-17MINUTE ORDER approving 10 notice of dismissal. This case is DISMISSED and closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/17/10. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 05/17/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar