Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2010-03-04 | 1 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Department of Health and Human Services from Freeborn County District Court, case number 24-cv-10-129. Assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Summons and Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Notice of Filing, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Certificate of Service) (RLR) (Entered: 03/05/2010) |
2010-03-15 | 2 | ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2010 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/15/10. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(LPH) (Entered: 03/15/2010) |
2010-03-18 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen O Plunkett on behalf of Brianna Broitzman, Alicia Heilmann, Ashton Larson, Kaylee Nash. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Plunkett, Stephen) (Entered: 03/18/2010) |
2010-03-19 | 4 | MOTION to Remand to State Court by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010) |
2010-03-19 | 5 | NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010) |
2010-03-19 | 6 | MEMORANDUM in Support re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010) |
2010-03-19 | 7 | AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in SUPPORT OF 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010) |
2010-03-19 | 8 | LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 6 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010) |
2010-03-19 | 9 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court, 7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 5 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 8 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 03/19/2010) |
2010-03-26 | 10 | MOTION to Compel Return of Documents by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010) |
2010-03-26 | 11 | NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010) |
2010-03-26 | 12 | MEMORANDUM by United States Department of Health and Human Services re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents , 11 Notice of Hearing on Motion Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and to Release Uncensored Documents, and in Support of Motion to Compel Return of Documents filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010) |
2010-03-26 | 13 | EXHIBIT A re 12 Memorandum, by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010) |
2010-03-26 | 14 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Health and Human Services re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents , 12 Memorandum, 11 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 13 Exhibits. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 03/26/2010) |
2010-04-01 | 15 | BRIEF Response to Notice of Intervention . (Kosieradzki, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2010) |
2010-04-01 | 16 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 15 Brief Response to Notice of Intervention . (Kosieradzki, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2010) |
2010-04-05 | 17 | ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sylvia Wulff, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Beverly Butts to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on April 5, 2010. (slf) (Entered: 04/05/2010) |
2010-04-06 | 18 | MOTION to Intervene by Minnesota Department of Health. (Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010) |
2010-04-06 | 19 | NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 18 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010) |
2010-04-06 | 20 | MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Minnesota Department of Health. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010) |
2010-04-06 | 21 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Minnesota Department of Health re 19 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 18 MOTION to Intervene, 20 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Manka, Audrey) (Entered: 04/06/2010) |
2010-04-08 | 22 | NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A Zurek on behalf of Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Zurek, Barbara) (Entered: 04/08/2010) |
2010-04-23 | 23 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents AND OPPOSING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010) |
2010-04-23 | 24 | AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in SUPPORT OF 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s), # 5 Exhibit(s), # 6 Exhibit(s), # 7 Exhibit(s), # 8 Exhibit(s), # 9 Exhibit(s), # 10 Exhibit(s), # 11 Exhibit(s))(Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010) |
2010-04-23 | 25 | LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 23 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010) |
2010-04-23 | 26 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 25 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 23 Reply to Response to Motion, 24 Affidavit in Support of Motion. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/23/2010) |
2010-04-27 | 27 | REPORT 26f by Brianna Broitzman, Beverly Butts, Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The, Alicia Heilmann, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Ashton Larson, Minnesota Department of Health, Kaylee Nash, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Sylvia Wulff. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 04/27/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 28 | MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 29 | AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in OPPOSITION TO 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 30 | LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 31 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 29 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 30 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 32 | MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 33 | AFFIDAVIT of Joel E. Smith in OPPOSITION TO 18 MOTION to Intervene filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 34 | LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-04-30 | 35 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beverly Butts, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Sylvia Wulff re 34 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 33 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. (Smith, Joel) (Entered: 04/30/2010) |
2010-05-03 | 36 | STIPULATION for Remand by Brianna Broitzman, Beverly Butts, Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The, Alicia Heilmann, Kenneth Hojberg, Clare Knutson, Ashton Larson, Minnesota Department of Health, Kaylee Nash, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Sylvia Wulff. (Wilhelm, D) (Entered: 05/03/2010) |
2010-05-03 | | ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Pretrial conference scheduled for May 4, 2010, and the motion hearing scheduled for May 7, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Noel are all canceled, in light of the stipulation for remand. (CAO) (Entered: 05/03/2010) |
2010-05-03 | 37 | NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re 10 MOTION to Compel Return of Documents by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wilhelm, D) Modified text on 5/4/2010 (kt). (Entered: 05/03/2010) |
2010-05-04 | 38 | NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion re 18 MOTION to Intervene by Minnesota Department of Health. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Manka, Audrey) Modified text on 5/5/2010 (kt). (Entered: 05/04/2010) |
2010-05-12 | 39 | ORDER re 36 Stipulation, filed by Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, The, Sylvia Wulff, Clare Knutson, Minnesota Department of Health, Brianna Broitzman, Ashton Larson, Alicia Heilmann, Kenneth Hojberg, United States Department of Health and Human Services, Kaylee Nash, Beverly Butts. This matter is remanded to the Minnesota State District Court in Freeborn County, Minnesota. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on May 12, 2010. (slf) (Entered: 05/12/2010) |
Hide Docket Events |
|