Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2016-06-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4576601) filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons Department of Justice, # 4 Summons US Attorney's Office)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (jd) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-06-22 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 06/22/2016) |
2016-07-11 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marian L. Borum on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Borum, Marian) (Entered: 07/11/2016) |
2016-07-22 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/27/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/27/2016. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/22/2016) |
2016-07-27 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Borum, Marian) (Entered: 07/27/2016) |
2016-08-29 | 6 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Marian L. Borum (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/29/2016) |
2016-10-05 | 7 | GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/05/16. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/05/2016) |
2016-10-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before November 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/5/16. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/05/2016) |
2016-10-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule due by 11/11/2016. (hs) (Entered: 10/05/2016) |
2016-11-10 | 8 | STATUS REPORT by Defendant, pursuant to the Court's Minute Order dated Oct. 5, 2016 by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/10/2016) |
2016-11-10 | 9 | STATUS REPORT by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2016) |
2016-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendant's Report 8 and the Plaintiff's Proposed Schedule 9 , and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his amended complaint on or before November 21, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its response on or before 21 days after the plaintiff files his amended complaint. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule governing further proceedings on or before 14 days after the government files its answer. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/14/16. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 11/14/2016) |
2016-11-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 11/21/2016. (hs) (Entered: 11/15/2016) |
2016-11-21 | 10 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/21/2016) |
2016-12-12 | 11 | ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 10 Amended Complaint filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/12/2016) |
2016-12-23 | 12 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/23/2016) |
2016-12-27 | 13 | STATUS REPORT by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/27/2016) |
2017-01-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 12 Defendant's Proposed Schedule and 13 Plaintiff's Proposed Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Office of Information Policy shall complete its processing of the records responsive to the Freedom of Information Act ("FOIA") requests directed to it by February 28, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the Federal Bureau of Investigation shall complete its processing of the records responsive to the FOIA requests directed to it by July 31, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the government shall file a status report on or before April 30, 2017, regarding ongoing production. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 4, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 01/04/2017) |
2017-01-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Status Report due by 4/30/2017 (hs) (Entered: 01/04/2017) |
2017-02-27 | 14 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete OIP's Processing by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/27/2017) |
2017-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 14 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for OIP to Complete its Processing, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Office of Information Policy shall complete its processing of the records responsive to the Freedom of Information Act requests directed to it by March 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 27, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/27/2017) |
2017-04-28 | 15 | STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/28/2017) |
2017-05-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 15 Defendant's Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the FBI shall file a status report, which may include a motion for an extension of time to complete production, on or before July 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 8, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/08/2017) |
2017-05-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/31/2017 (hs) (Entered: 05/08/2017) |
2017-07-31 | 16 | STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration FBI, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/31/2017) |
2017-07-31 | 17 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete FBI's Processing of Documents Referred to It By OIP by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration FBI, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/31/2017) |
2017-08-01 | 18 | Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete FBI's Processing of Documents Referred to It By OIP filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/01/2017) |
2017-08-07 | 19 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete FBI's Processing of Documents Referred to It By OIP filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration FBI Supplemental Decl.)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 08/07/2017) |
2017-08-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of The FBI's Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time to Complete its Processing, the plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time, and the Reply in Further Support of the FBI's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete its Processing, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the FBI shall complete its processing of the records referred to it by the Office of Information Policy on or before February 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 14, 2017. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/14/2017) |
2018-02-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Given that the deadline for the defendant to complete its processing of responsive records was February 1, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report governing further proceedings in this case, including, if necessary, a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions, on or before February 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 2, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/02/2018) |
2018-02-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/16/2018 (hs) (Entered: 02/02/2018) |
2018-02-16 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/16/2018) |
2018-02-20 | 21 | ORDER. Upon consideration of the 20 Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before August 2, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his opposition to the defendant's motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before September 17, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before November 1, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his reply in support of any cross-motion on or before December 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 20, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/20/2018) |
2018-02-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to Summary Judgment motion/Cross- Motion due by 8/2/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/17/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/1/2018. Plaintiff's Reply in support of any Cross Motion due by 12/6/2018. (hs) (Entered: 02/20/2018) |
2018-08-01 | 22 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Modify Remainder of Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha). Added MOTION to Modify on 8/8/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 08/01/2018) |
2018-08-02 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 22 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Modify Remainder of Briefing Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before September 6, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his opposition to the defendant's motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 22, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before December 6, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his reply in support of any cross-motion on or before January 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 2, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/02/2018) |
2018-08-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 9/6/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross Motion due by 10/22/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/6/2018. Reply in support of Cross Motion due by 1/28/2019. (hs) (Entered: 08/03/2018) |
2018-09-06 | 23 | NOTICE of Filing FBI's Declaration in Support of DOJ's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 FBI's Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B-H, # 4 Exhibit I-O, # 5 Exhibit P-CC, # 6 Exhibit DD-RR, # 7 Exhibit SS-III, # 8 Exhibit JJJ-FFFF, # 9 Exhibit GGGG-IIIII, # 10 Exhibit JJJJJ-PPPPP, # 11 Exhibit QQQQQ-TTTTT)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/06/2018) |
2018-09-06 | 24 | MOTION for Summary Judgment , with FBI Declaration filed as ECF No. 23, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration OIP Declaration, # 3 OIP Exhibit Index, # 4 OIP's Exhibits A-S, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/07/2018) |
2018-10-19 | 25 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , with FBI Declaration filed as ECF No. 23, by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2018) |
2018-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 25 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his opposition to the defendant's motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 24, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before December 10, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his reply in support of any cross-motion on or before January 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 22, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/22/2018) |
2018-10-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment/Cross Motion due by 10/24/2018. Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment/Opposition to Cross Motion due by 12/10/2018. Reply in support of Cross Motions due by 1/30/2019. (hs) (Entered: 10/22/2018) |
2018-10-24 | 26 | Memorandum in opposition to re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , with FBI Declaration filed as ECF No. 23, filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit 1-10, # 5 Exhibit 11-20, # 6 Exhibit 21-25)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/25/2018) |
2018-10-25 | 27 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit 1-10, # 5 Exhibit 11-20, # 6 Exhibit 21-25)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/25/2018) |
2018-12-03 | 28 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Combined Reply and Opposition and to Modify Filing Deadline for Plaintiff's Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/03/2018) |
2018-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion on or before February 15, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his reply in support of any cross-motion on or before March 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 6, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 12/06/2018) |
2018-12-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's reply in support of its motion and opposition to any cross-motion due on or before February 15, 2019. Plaintiff's reply in support of any cross-motion due on or before March 18. (hs) (Entered: 12/07/2018) |
2019-02-12 | 29 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Combined Reply and Opposition and to Modify Filing Deadline for Defendant's Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/12/2019) |
2019-02-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Combined Reply and Opposition and to Modify Filing Deadline for Plaintiff's Reply, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and its opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 16, 2019. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his motion for summary judgment on or before May 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 14, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/14/2019) |
2019-02-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 4/16/2019. Reply in support of Cross Motion due by 5/7/2019. Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/16/2019. (hs) (Entered: 02/15/2019) |
2019-04-16 | 30 | Memorandum in opposition to re 27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OIP Suppl. Decl., # 2 Declaration FBI Suppl. Decl. and Exs. A-C, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2019) |
2019-04-16 | 31 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , with FBI Declaration filed as ECF No. 23, filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 OIP Suppl. Decl., # 2 FBI Suppl. Decl. and Exs. A-C, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/16/2019) |
2019-05-03 | 32 | Consent MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,, by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/03/2019) |
2019-05-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 32 Consent Motion to Stay, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending the Supreme Court's resolution of Food Marketing Institute v. Argus Leader Media. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before July 1, 2019, regarding whether this case should remain stayed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 7, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-05-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2019 (hs) (Entered: 05/07/2019) |
2019-07-01 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 07/01/2019) |
2019-07-03 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 33 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay entered by the Court on May 7, 2019, is LIFTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment on or before July 31, 2019. It is further ORDERED that, on or before August 14, 2019, the defendant shall file either its sur-reply to the plaintiff's reply or a notice representing that it will not be filing a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 3, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/03/2019) |
2019-07-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/31/2019. Sur-Reply or notice due by 8/14/2019. (tj) (Entered: 07/05/2019) |
2019-07-31 | 34 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/31/2019) |
2019-08-01 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 34 Consent Motion for an Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file his reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment on or before August 28, 2019. It is further ORDERED that, on or before September 20, 2019, the defendant shall file either its sur-reply to the plaintiff's reply or a notice representing that it will not be filing a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 1, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/01/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Reply in support of his Cross Motions due by 8/28/2019. Defendant's sur-reply to the plaintiff's reply or a notice representing that it will not be filing a sur-reply due by 9/20/2019. (hs) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-28 | 35 | MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/28/2019) |
2019-08-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the plaintiff's 35 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the page limitation prescribed in Local Civil Rule 7(e) is WAIVED with respect to the plaintiff's forthcoming reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff's reply in support of his cross-motion for summary judgment shall not exceed thirty (30) pages. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 35-2, and accompanying exhibits, ECF No. 35-3, are ACCEPTED AS FILED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file them as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 29, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/29/2019) |
2019-08-29 | 36 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ztd) (Entered: 08/30/2019) |
2019-09-20 | 37 | NOTICE Pursuant to the Court's Minute Order dated August 1, 2019 by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 09/20/2019) |
2021-04-16 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional information before resolving the parties' motions for summary judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on May 4, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 16, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/16/2021) |
2021-04-18 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 04/18/2021) |
2021-05-04 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 5/4/2021. Status Conference set for 7/27/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-05-04 | 38 | ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on July 27, 2021, at 10:00 a.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the parties' motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 4, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/04/2021) |
2021-07-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending motions in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for July 27, 2021, is CONTINUED to October 25, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 27, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/27/2021) |
2021-07-28 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/28/2021) |
2021-10-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending motions in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for October 25, 2021, is CONTINUED to January 17, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 22, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/22/2021) |
2021-10-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the federal holiday on January 17, 2022, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for January 17, 2022, is CONTINUED to January 18, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 26, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/26/2021) |
2021-10-26 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 1/18/2022 at 09:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 10/26/2021) |
2022-01-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending motions in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for January 18, 2022, is CONTINUED to May 2, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 14, 2022. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 01/14/2022) |
2022-01-14 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 5/2/2022 at 10:00 AM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/14/2022) |
2022-04-27 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending motions in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 2, 2022, is CONTINUED to July 26, 2022, at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 27, 2022. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/27/2022) |
2022-04-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/26/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/28/2022) |
2022-07-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending motions in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for July 26, 2022, is CONTINUED to October 18, 2022, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2022. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/20/2022) |
2022-07-22 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/18/2022 at 9:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mac) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-10-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for October 18, 2022, is CONTINUED to January 18, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 12, 2022. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/12/2022) |
2023-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for January 18, 2023, is CONTINUED to April 18, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 9, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-04-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for April 18, 2023, is CONTINUED to July 18, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 13, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
2023-07-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for July 18, 2023, is CONTINUED to October 16, 2023, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 14, 2023. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-10-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for October 16, 2023, is CONTINUED to January 16, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 11, 2023. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
2024-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for January 16, 2024, is CONTINUED to April 16, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the Court's resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 10, 2024. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
2024-02-10 | 39 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Marsha Wellknown Yee (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 02/10/2024) |
2024-03-21 | 40 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kimberly Stratton on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Diana V. Valdivia (Stratton, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/21/2024) |
2024-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for April 16, 2024, is CONTINUED to July 16, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the Court's resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 12, 2024. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 04/12/2024) |
2024-07-12 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for July 16, 2024, is CONTINUED to October 15, 2024, at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the Court's resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 12, 2024. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/12/2024) |
2024-10-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for October 15, 2024, is CONTINUED to February 14, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the Court's resolution of the pending cross-motions for summary judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motions by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 9, 2024. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 10/09/2024) |
2025-02-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for February 14, 2025, is CONTINUED to May 15, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 646-828-7666, entering the Meeting ID 161 591 8885 followed by the pound key (#), and then entering the Passcode 984979 followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending motions in this case. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motion by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 7, 2025. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/07/2025) |
2025-05-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. The Court requiring additional time to consider the pending cross-motions for summary judgment in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for May 15, 2025, is CONTINUED to August 18, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall appear before the Court via teleconference, by calling 646-828-7666, entering the Meeting ID 161 591 8885 followed by the pound key (#), and then entering the Passcode 984979 followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending motions in this case. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the motion by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 9, 2025. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/09/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |