Andrew Jones submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning his claims file. After hearing nothing from the agency, Jones filed an administrative appeal of the agency's delay in responding. After hearing further, Jones filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees
Defendant
Robert Wilkie Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs
Defendant
James Byrne General Counsel of the Department of Veterans Affairs
COMPLAINT filed by Andrew Jones. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-8627791) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-06-18
Case Reassigned to Judge Jean-Paul Boulee. Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:19-cv-1936-JPB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rsh) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-21
2
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Andrew Jones (Nabors, William) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-21
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING 2 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i). (ddm) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-21
Civil Case Terminated. (ddm) (Entered: 06/21/2019)