Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-07-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9388146) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-7, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-07-21 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-07-21 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 07/21/2022) |
2022-07-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsss) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-07-22 | 4 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsss) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-19 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 09/19/2022) |
2022-09-21 | 7 | ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of their production of documents to plaintiff, on or before October 19, 2022. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/21/2022. (jth) (Entered: 09/21/2022) |
2022-10-19 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 10/19/2022) |
2022-10-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 8 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by November 18, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/20/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/20/2022) |
2022-11-18 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 11/18/2022) |
2022-11-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 9 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by February 17, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/21/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2023-02-17 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 10 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by April 18, 2023.Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/22/23. (DMK) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-04-18 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CATO INSTITUTE. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-04-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 12 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by May 18, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/19/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/19/2023) |
2023-05-18 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 05/18/2023) |
2023-05-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 13 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by August 16, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/22/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 14 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Derek S. Hammond (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-08-16 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CATO INSTITUTE. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 08/16/2023) |
2023-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 15 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by November 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/21/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-11-15 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2023-11-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 16 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by February 13, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/20/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2024-02-14 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2024) |
2024-02-14 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT (Corrected) by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2024) |
2024-02-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 18 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by May 14, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/2024. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/14/2024) |
2024-05-14 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/14/2024) |
2024-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 19 joint status report, the parties must file another joint status report by August 13, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/15/2024. (Entered: 05/15/2024) |
2024-08-13 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/13/2024) |
2024-08-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 20 joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties must file another joint status report by October 31, 2024. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/14/2024. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/14/2024) |
2024-10-30 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 10/30/2024) |
2024-10-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 21 joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties must file another joint status report by January 28, 2025. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/30/2024. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/30/2024) |
2025-01-28 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/28/2025) |
2025-01-29 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 22 joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties must file another joint status report by April 29, 2025. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/29/2025. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/29/2025) |
2025-04-29 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 04/29/2025) |
2025-04-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 23 joint status report, it is ORDERED that the parties must file another joint status report by July 31, 2025. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/30/2025. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/30/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |