Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-11-03 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7123777.), filed by Protect Our Defenders, Connecticut Veterans Legal Center. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wishnie on behalf of Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Intern Appearances by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Attachments: # 1 Jackson Akselrad, # 2 Brian Liu, # 3 Renee Mihail, # 4 Maggie Mills)(Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | | Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. in Freedom of Information Act action (Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | | Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge Robert A. Richardson added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 4 | Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/2/2023. Discovery due by 5/5/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 6/9/2023. Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 5 | ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/3/2022.(Mendez, D) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 6 | STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/3/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 7 | NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 6 Protective Order, 5 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, 3 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Intern Appearances filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, 1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. Signed by Clerk on 11/4/2022. (Mendez, D) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 8 | *** ENTERED IN ERROR*** ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Meghan Brooks* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Yale Law School* *P.O. Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Mendez, D) Modified on 11/8/2022 (Imbriani, Susan). (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 9 | ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Victor A. Bolden for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/4/2022.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 10 | ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/4/2022.(Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 11/07/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 15 | STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/4/2022.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-07 | 11 | ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave for Law Student Interns to Appear. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/7/2022. (Sullivan, John) (Entered: 11/07/2022) |
2022-11-08 | 12 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Meghan Brooks* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Yale Law School* *P.O. Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 11/08/2022) |
2022-11-08 | | Docket Entry Correction - Summons reissued as the number of days for response was incorrect as case is a FOIA case. (Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 11/08/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 13 | MOTION to Amend/Correct 12 Electronic Summons Reissued, by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders.Responses due by 11/30/2022 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons)(Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 14 | ORDER granting 13 motion to Amend/Correct 12 Electronic Summons. See 5 U.S.C.A. § 552(A)(4)(C) ("Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead to any complaint made under this subsection within thirty days after service upon the defendant of the pleading in which such complaint is made, unless the court otherwise directs for good cause shown.") The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to reissue the Summons to reflect that Defendants shall file an Answer or a responsive pleading within thirty days after service upon them is completed. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/10/2022. (Diallo, I.) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 16 | NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 10 Electronic Filing Order, 15 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, 3 MOTION for Leave to File Law Student Intern Appearances filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders, 1 Complaint, filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2022.(Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 17 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS REISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Meghan Brooks* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services Organization Yale Law School* *PO Box 209090* *New Haven, CT 06520-9090*. (Imbriani, Susan) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-17 | 18 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protect Our Defenders, Connecticut Veterans Legal Center. United States Department of Defense served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/14/2022; United States Department of Justice served on 11/14/2022, answer due 12/14/2022. (Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 11/17/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 19 | NOTICE of Appearance by J. Brian Meskill on behalf of United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 20 | First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 13, 2023 (29 Days) to Answer or Respond to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice. (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 21 | ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall Answer or Respond to the Complaint by January 13, 2023 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/9/2022. (Diallo, I.) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-10 | | NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/13/2022 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Dial In: (888) 808-6929 Participant Code: 9284309 (Diallo, I.) (Entered: 12/10/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 22 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Status Conference held on 12/13/2022. Total Time: 3 minutes. (Court Reporter Sharon Montini) (Diallo, I.) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2023-01-13 | 23 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice.(Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-01-13 | 24 | MOTION to Transfer to Another District by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 25 | Memorandum in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Alden Pinkham, CVLC)(Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-15 | 26 | REPLY to Response to 24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice. (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 02/15/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 27 | ORDER denying 24 Motion to Transfer to Another District. For reasons stated in the attached Ruling and Order, Defendants' motion to transfer to another district is DENIED . The parties are directed to confer and submit a joint proposed scheduling order in this case by May 12, 2023 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/28/2023. (Diallo, I.) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-05-04 | 28 | PROPOSED ORDER Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 29 | SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court adopts the following schedule for pre-trial deadlines based on the parties' joint proposed scheduling order, the Court's preferences with respect to scheduling, and the Court's current calendar: - Defendants shall produce any responsive, non-exempt records to Plaintiffs on a rolling basis as soon as the records are available for production, but no later than the following dates: First Production: May 31, 2023 . Second Production: June 30, 2023 Within 15 days of each production, the parties shall meet and confer on the issues remaining in the case. - If the parties have not resolved the outstanding issues in the case following the Second Production, the parties shall submit a status report for the Court on these issues and any other outstanding issues no later than 30 days after the second and final production of responsive, non-exempt records. - If a motion for summary judgment is necessary, Defendants shall file their Motion for Summary Judgment no later than 60 days from the date of the Second Production, accompanied by any Vaughn indices and search declarations not yet produced. - Plaintiffs' Response and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due no later than 30 days from the date of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. - Defendants' Reply and Response shall be due no later than 21 days following Plaintiffs' Response and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. - Plaintiffs' Reply shall be due no later than 21 days following Defendants' Response. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/5/2023. (Diallo, I.) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 30 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Intern Jarek Neczypor by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Attachments: # 1 Certifications)(Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-09 | 31 | ORDER granting 30 the motion for leave to appear of law student intern, Jarek Neczypor. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/9/2023. (Diallo, I.) (Entered: 05/09/2023) |
2023-06-14 | 32 | MOTION for Meghan Brooks to Withdraw as Attorney by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Brooks, Meghan) (Entered: 06/14/2023) |
2023-06-15 | 33 | ORDER granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Meghan Brooks terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/15/2023. (Sullivan, John) (Entered: 06/15/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 34 | MOTION for Leave to Appear as Law Student Interns by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ethan Dilks Certification, # 2 Exhibit Sydney Wagner Certification)(Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-27 | 35 | ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave for Law School Interns Ethan Dilks and Sydney Wagner to Appear. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/27/2023. (Sullivan, John) (Entered: 07/27/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders. (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-08-15 | 37 | NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Friedlander on behalf of Connecticut Veterans Legal Center, Protect Our Defenders (Friedlander, Natalia) (Entered: 08/15/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 38 | First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2023 to file motion for summary judgment, if necessary by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice. (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-08-23 | 39 | ORDER GRANTING 38 First MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2023 to file motion for summary judgment, if necessary. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/23/2023. (Thompson, M.) (Entered: 08/23/2023) |
2023-09-15 | 40 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until October 13, 2023 to file Defendants' motion for summary judgment, if necessary by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice. (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 09/15/2023) |
2023-09-18 | 41 | ORDER granting 40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for extension of time to file Defendants' motion for summary judgment until October 13, 2023 . Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/18/2023. (Thompson, M.) (Entered: 09/18/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 42 | STIPULATION of Dismissal of both parties with fees reservation by United States Department of Defense, United States Department of Justice. (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-10-16 | 43 | ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Based on the 42 joint stipulation of dismissal, this case is DISMISSED with prejudice , reserving jurisdiction as to any claim for costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 10/16/2023. (Thompson, M.) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-10-16 | | JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Murphy, Tatihana) (Entered: 10/17/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |