Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-06-29 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27944209)Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A.) FOIA request for records, # 2 Exhibit B.) email acknowledgment of receipt of FOIA Request).(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 3 | RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 4 | FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Myers, Celyra) Modified on 6/30/2023 (vf). (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 5 | FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Myers, Celyra) Modified on 6/30/2023 (vf). (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-06-30 | | ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Celyra Imani Myers. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (vf) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-06-30 | | CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(vf) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-06-30 | | Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (vf) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-06-30 | | Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-06-30 | | ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Celyra Imani Myers to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the date field on the official A.O. Summons form was completed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-10 | 6 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law..(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-10 | 7 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law..(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 8 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (sj) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 9 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (sj) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-08-11 | 10 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Kristofcak on behalf of U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kristofcak, Alexander) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 11 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit U.S. Attorney General for DHS).(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 12 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint, served. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/31/2023, answer due 8/30/2023. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit U.S. Attorney General for ICE).(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-17 | 13 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of 1 Complaint served on U.S. Department of Justice on 7/31/23. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law..(Myers, Celyra) (Entered: 08/17/2023) |
2023-08-25 | 14 | MOTION for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28202276. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At Benjamin N. Cardozo School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit : Declaration of Thomas R. Burke ISO Motion for Pro Hac Admission with Certificate of Good Standings, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for PHV Admission).(Burke, Thomas) (Entered: 08/25/2023) |
2023-08-28 | | >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 14 MOTION for Thomas R. Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28202276. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sgz) (Entered: 08/28/2023) |
2023-08-28 | 15 | ORDER granting 14 Motion for Thomas R Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil)(Text Only Order) (rz) (Entered: 08/28/2023) |
2023-08-30 | 16 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kristofcak, Alexander) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-09-04 | 17 | NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/25/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/4/2023) (tg) (Entered: 09/05/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 18 | PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Kristofcak, Alexander) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |