Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-07-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10229098) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons HHS Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty Summons, # 5 Supplement Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 5)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2023) |
2023-07-25 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zljn) (Entered: 07/25/2023) |
2023-07-25 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 07/25/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Erika Kirstie Oblea on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 4 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-09-27 | 5 | ORDER granting Motion 4 for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and defendant shall respond to the complaint by 11/14/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/27/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-11-14 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2023-11-21 | 7 | MEET & CONFER ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/7/2023. (lcrcl3) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/7/2023) (zsmc). (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-12-20 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT with proposed order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2023-12-20 | 9 | MOTION to Stay Production by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (See Docket Entry 8 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2023-12-21 | 10 | ORDER granting Motion 9 to Stay; Set/Reset Deadlines: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file a status report on or before 02/20/2024. It is further ORDERED that the submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion are hereby STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/21/2023. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/21/2023) |
2024-02-20 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2024) |
2024-02-27 | 12 | ORDER: The parties shall file a status report on or before 04/20/2024. The submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion will continue to be stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/27/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/27/2024) |
2024-04-20 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 04/20/2024) |
2024-05-10 | 14 | ORDER: The parties shall file a status report on or before 06/20/2024. The submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion will continue to be stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/10/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 05/10/2024) |
2024-06-14 | 15 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE (Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 06/14/2024) |
2024-06-14 | 16 | NOTICE re 15 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests. (Bartkowski, Paul) Modified event on 6/17/2024 (znmw). (Entered: 06/14/2024) |
2024-06-20 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 06/20/2024) |
2024-07-12 | 18 | ORDER: The parties shall file a status report on or before 08/19/2024. The submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion will continue to be stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/12/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 07/12/2024) |
2024-08-19 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 08/19/2024) |
2024-09-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a status report on or before 10/18/2024. The submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion will continue to be stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/30/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 09/30/2024) |
2024-10-18 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 10/18/2024) |
2024-10-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a status report on or before 12/17/2024. The date for submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion will continue to be stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/21/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 10/21/2024) |
2024-12-17 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 12/17/2024) |
2024-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a status report on or before 2/18/2025. The date for submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion will continue to be stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/17/2024. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 12/17/2024) |
2025-02-18 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 02/18/2025) |
2025-02-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file a status report on or before 4/23/2025. The date for submission of a Vaughn index and dispositive motion will continue to be stayed pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/20/2025. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/20/2025) |
2025-04-23 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 04/23/2025) |
2025-04-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: As it appears that the last two Joint Status Reports of February 18, 2025 and April 23, 2025 are substantially identical and demonstrate no significant progress between those dates, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall attend a status hearing at 2:00 PM on May 7, 2025, in Courtroom 15, to update the Court on their progress and discuss whether a continued stay of dispositive motion briefing is warranted. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 04/28/2025. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/28/2025) |
2025-05-02 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Oblea, Erika) (Entered: 05/02/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |