Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-07-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10232842) filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-08-01 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 1, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/01/2023) |
2023-08-08 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/27/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix E-mail confirmation from USADC)(Ding, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/16/2023. (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/16/2023 (Ding, Michael) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-08-23 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, and DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by September 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 23, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/23/2023) |
2023-08-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's 1 Complaint due by 9/27/2023. (mac) (Entered: 08/24/2023) |
2023-09-27 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-10-11 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Meckler on behalf of AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
2023-10-11 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
2023-10-12 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 11 Joint Status Report, to file, by December 13, 2023, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 12, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2023. (zalh) (Entered: 10/16/2023) |
2023-12-13 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 12/13/2023) |
2023-12-14 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 12 Joint Status Report, to file, by February 12, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter and whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 14, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/14/2023) |
2023-12-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2024 (mac) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2024-02-12 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
2024-02-12 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 13 Joint Status Report, to file, by April 12, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter and whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 12, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
2024-02-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 4/12/2024. (mac) (Entered: 02/13/2024) |
2024-04-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/12/2024) |
2024-04-15 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 14 Joint Status Report, to file, by April 19, 2024, a joint status report with a proposed briefing schedule for their anticipated cross-motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 15, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/15/2024) |
2024-04-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2024. (mac) (Entered: 04/17/2024) |
2024-04-19 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/19/2024) |
2024-04-19 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) by July 26, 2024, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by August 16, 2024, plaintiff shall file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by August 30, 2024, defendant shall file any reply and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion; and (4) by September 13, 2024, plaintiff shall file any reply in support of the cross-motion. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 19, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/19/2024) |
2024-04-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 07/26/2024. Plaintiff Opposition And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2024. Defendant Reply And Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion due by 8/30/2024. Plaintiff Reply In Support Of The Cross-Motion due by 9/13/2024. (mac) (Entered: 04/22/2024) |
2024-06-06 | 16 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION (Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 06/06/2024) |
2024-07-26 | 17 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Statement of Facts, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/26/2024) |
2024-07-26 | 18 | ERRATA by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION re 17 Motion for Summary Judgment,. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Statement of Facts, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/26/2024) |
2024-08-16 | 19 | Memorandum in opposition to re 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by AMERICA FIRST LEGAL FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meckler, Jacob) (Entered: 08/16/2024) |
2024-08-28 | 20 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/28/2024) |
2024-08-28 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' 20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time; and MODIFYING the SCHEDULING ORDER issued on April 19, 2024, in light of the fact that only defendants, and not plaintiff, have moved for summary judgment, as follows: defendants shall file, by September 4, 2024, any reply in support of its 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 28, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/28/2024) |
2024-08-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/4/2024. (zalh) (Entered: 08/30/2024) |
2024-09-04 | 21 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Seidel Declaration)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/04/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |