Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-04 | 1 | Complaint (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Initial FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit Acknowledgement of FOIA request, # 4 Exhibit Notice of Hearing Immigration Court)(Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 2 | Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elyssa Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Alina Kilpatrick Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9156917. by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Pro hac vice application form)(Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-05 | | Notice of Correction re 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elyssa Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Alina Kilpatrick Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9156917. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. The motion filed also indicates that the applicant is a full-time employee of the United States of America requesting exemption from the filing fee. Local counsel should refile the motion with the corrected information including the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, ) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 3 | Proposed Summons by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 4 | Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons, the attached procedure for Civil Motions and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: # 1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(dbra, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-19 | 5 | Certificate Reporting Service by United States Department Of Justice. United States Department Of Justice served on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2023) |
2023-11-13 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice.(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2023-11-14 | | Refer for 16(b) (dbra, ) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2024-01-22 | 7 | RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2024 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 1/22/2024. (lhow) (Entered: 01/22/2024) |
2024-02-07 | 8 | Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery and Issuance of a Scheduling Order by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 02/07/2024) |
2024-02-07 | 9 | Memorandum in Support re 8 Consent MOTION to Stay Discovery and Issuance of a Scheduling Order filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 02/07/2024) |
2024-02-09 | 10 | ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay Discovery and the Issuance of a Scheduling Order. The Rule 16(b) telephonic scheduling conference for 2/12/2024 is STRICKEN. Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Notice within 7 days of completing their FOIA response. See order for additional directives. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 2/9/2024. (dbra, ) (Entered: 02/09/2024) |
2024-03-04 | 11 | NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice re 10 Order on Motion to Stay, (Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 03/04/2024) |
2024-03-11 | 12 | NOTICE by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice re 10 Order on Motion to Stay, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 03/11/2024) |
2024-04-08 | 13 | SCHEDULING ORDER: The Defendants shall file a Motion for Summary Judgment, along with any supporting documents, on or before 5/20/2024. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/8/24. (ajones) (Entered: 04/08/2024) |
2024-05-20 | 14 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 05/20/2024) |
2024-05-20 | 15 | Memorandum in Support re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of S. White (with exhibits))(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 05/20/2024) |
2024-06-19 | 16 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law and Exhibits)(Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 06/19/2024) |
2024-06-19 | 17 | MOTION to Seal Exhibit by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 06/19/2024) |
2024-06-19 | 18 | Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez re 17 MOTION to Seal Exhibit (Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 06/19/2024) |
2024-06-19 | 19 | Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re 18 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C). (Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 06/19/2024) |
2024-06-19 | 20 | Memorandum in Support re 17 MOTION to Seal Exhibit filed by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 06/19/2024) |
2024-07-01 | 21 | ORDER granting 17 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 7/1/24. (bwell) (Entered: 07/01/2024) |
2024-07-02 | 22 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment /Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 07/02/2024) |
2024-07-02 | 23 | Memorandum in Support re 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment /Motion to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendants' Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 07/02/2024) |
2024-07-03 | 24 | ORDER granting 22 Consent Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order ENTERED AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 7/3/24. (jhie, ) (Entered: 07/03/2024) |
2024-08-23 | 25 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 08/23/2024) |
2024-09-06 | 26 | Reply to 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 09/06/2024) |
2025-03-28 | 27 | ORDER. Defendant's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Plaintiff's 16 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The BOP is hereby ORDERED to conduct an adequate search. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint letter to this Court setting out an agreed-upon scope of the search. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's request for reasonable attorney's fees and litigation costs reasonably incurred in this action, pursuant to 5 U.S.C. §552(a)(4)(E). Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 3/28/25. (bwell) (Entered: 03/28/2025) |
2025-04-17 | 28 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 27 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,, by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 04/17/2025) |
2025-04-18 | 29 | ORDER granting 28 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. The deadline for submitting a joint letter to the Court setting out an agreed-upon scope of the search, as stated in the Court's March 28, 2025 Order (ECF No. 27) is hereby EXTENDED to Friday, April 25, 2025. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/17/25. (bwell) (Entered: 04/18/2025) |
2025-04-25 | 30 | Letter re: Order (ECF No. 27) . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Search Plan)(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 04/25/2025) |
2025-04-28 | 31 | ORDER. The Joint Proposed Search Plan 30 is hereby APPROVED. The BOP is DIRECTED to file an update with the Court regarding progress made on the search every thirty (30) days from the date of this Order until the new search has been completed, and a final update with the Court once the search is complete. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 4/28/25. (bwell) (Entered: 04/28/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |