Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-05 | 1 | COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-22369602 filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Froderman, Troy) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(MYE) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 2 | SUMMONS Submitted by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Froderman, Troy) (MYE) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 3 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Froderman, Troy) (MYE) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 4 | Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-22369602. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-2085-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 5 | Summons Issued as to United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 6 | NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. A section is missing from the provided Civil Cover Sheet. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 7 | AMENDED DOCUMENT by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. Amendment to 6 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only),, 1 Complaint, Amended Civil Cover Sheet . (Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 8 | SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits 1-7, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability, Civil Cover Sheet upon Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Highway Division on October 10, 2023. (Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-12-27 | 9 | SUMMONS Submitted by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 12/27/2023) |
2023-12-28 | 10 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (BAS) (Entered: 12/28/2023) |
2024-01-03 | 11 | SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Highway Division, c/o U.S. Attorney's Office Gary M. Restaino on 12/28/23. (Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 01/03/2024) |
2024-01-12 | 12 | *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Highway Division on 12/28/23. (Froderman, Troy) *Modified to correct service date on 1/16/2024 (CSL). (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
2024-01-29 | 13 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division.(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 01/29/2024) |
2024-02-22 | 14 | NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 02/22/2024) |
2024-02-23 | 15 | ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for April 9, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 504, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. before Judge Michael T Liburdi. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 2/23/2024. (CSL) (Entered: 02/23/2024) |
2024-03-13 | 16 | NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Troy Blinn Froderman. (Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 03/13/2024) |
2024-03-29 | 17 | MOTION to Expedite Case , MOTION to Vacate 15 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, (Stipulated) by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 03/29/2024) |
2024-03-29 | 18 | NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 03/29/2024) |
2024-03-29 | 19 | ORDER granting the Stipulated Motion (Doc. 17 ). FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 4/9/24, at 2:00 PM. FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall confer within 21 days of the date of this Order and file a Stipulation to a briefing schedule for the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 3/29/24. (NKS) (Entered: 03/29/2024) |
2024-04-17 | 20 | NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 04/17/2024) |
2024-04-19 | 21 | STIPULATION re: 19 Order re: Briefing Schedule by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 04/19/2024) |
2024-04-22 | 22 | ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule 21 : Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment no later than June 21, 2024. Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion for summary judgment no later than July 22, 2024. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment no later than August 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 4/22/2024. (LMR) (Entered: 04/22/2024) |
2024-06-10 | 23 | First MOTION for Extension of Time of the Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 06/10/2024) |
2024-06-21 | 24 | MOTION for Attorney Fees by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 06/21/2024) |
2024-06-24 | 25 | ORDER that the summary judgment briefing deadlines established in the Court's April 22, 2024, Order 22 are extended by three weeks. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment no later than July 12, 2024. Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion for summary judgment no later than August 12, 2024. Defendant shall file its reply to the motion for summary judgment no later than August 27, 2024. FURTHER ORDERED affirming that Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule 23 is due on June 24, 2024. Plaintiff shall state with particularity why it opposes Defendant's request for a 3-month extension. Defendant may file a reply brief no later than July 1. 2024. The Court will then evaluate the Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule 23 and issue an order forthwith. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 6/21/2024. (REK) (Entered: 06/24/2024) |
2024-06-24 | 26 | RESPONSE to Motion re: 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time of the Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 06/24/2024) |
2024-07-01 | 27 | REPLY to Response to Motion re: 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time of the Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule filed by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2024) |
2024-07-03 | 28 | ORDER granting in part Defendant's Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Briefing Schedule 23 . Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment no later than July 26, 2024. Plaintiff shall file its response to the motion for summary judgment no later than August 23, 2024. Defendant shall file its reply to the motion for summary judgment no later than September 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/2/2024. (LMR) (Entered: 07/03/2024) |
2024-07-05 | 29 | RESPONSE to Motion re: 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 07/05/2024) |
2024-07-12 | 30 | REPLY to Response to Motion re: 24 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brent Frye, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Proposed Order)(Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 07/12/2024) |
2024-07-26 | 31 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 07/26/2024) |
2024-07-26 | 32 | STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 07/26/2024) |
2024-08-23 | 33 | RESPONSE to Motion re: 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 08/23/2024) |
2024-08-23 | 34 | STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 33 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Froderman, Troy) (Entered: 08/23/2024) |
2024-09-09 | 35 | REPLY to Response to Motion re: 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supp'l Decl re Status Update)(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 09/09/2024) |
2024-11-01 | 36 | NOTICE of Settlement by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 11/01/2024) |
2024-11-03 | 37 | ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall, without further notice, dismiss this case on December 2, 2024, with prejudice, unless prior thereto, a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement (Doc. 36 ). FURTHER ORDERED that any pending deadlines in this matter are stayed. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 11/1/24. (EJA) (Entered: 11/03/2024) |
2024-12-02 | 38 | *MOTION for Extension of Time to Dismiss by Arrow Indian Contractors Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order proposed order)(Froderman, Troy) *Modified to remove Ex Parte designation on 12/3/2024 (EJA). (Entered: 12/02/2024) |
2024-12-02 | 39 | ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/4/2024 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Michael T Liburdi.See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 12/2/2024. (LMR) (Entered: 12/02/2024) |
2024-12-04 | 40 | MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T Liburdi: Status Conference held on 12/4/2024. Case status is discussed. Separate order to issue. APPEARANCES: Troy Froderman and Pierce Libbey for Plaintiff. Lisa Hemann for Defendant. (Court Reporter Cathy Taylor.) Hearing held 9:47 AM to 9:55 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR) (Entered: 12/04/2024) |
2024-12-04 | 41 | ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Dismiss (Doc. 38 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall dismiss this case on Friday, January 24, 2025, with prejudice, unless prior thereto, a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement or files a motion to extend the dismissal deadline. Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees (Doc. 24 ) and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 31 ) are denied as moot in light of the pending settlement. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 12/4/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR) (Entered: 12/04/2024) |
2024-12-16 | 42 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States Federal Highway Administration, Central Federal Lands Division. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hemann, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2024) |
2024-12-17 | 43 | ORDER dismissing this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending deadlines and hearings are hereby vacated. FINALLY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to enter a judgment of dismissal and close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 12/16/2024. (REK) (Entered: 12/17/2024) |
2024-12-17 | 44 | CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the Court's order filed December 17, 2024, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed with prejudice. (REK) (Entered: 12/17/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |