Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-11-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10509521) filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-10, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-21 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-12-05 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/4/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/3/2024. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 12/05/2023) |
2023-12-05 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/4/23. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 12/05/2023) |
2023-12-05 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/4/2023 (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 12/05/2023) |
2023-12-26 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bartholomew on behalf of U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/26/2023) |
2023-12-26 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/26/2023) |
2023-12-28 | 9 | MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer the complaint by February 2, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/28/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/28/2023) |
2024-01-29 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 01/29/2024) |
2024-01-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by March 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/30/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/30/2024) |
2024-02-28 | 11 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 02/28/2024) |
2024-02-29 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by April 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/29/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/29/2024) |
2024-04-01 | 12 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 04/01/2024) |
2024-04-02 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by May 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/2/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 04/02/2024) |
2024-05-03 | 13 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 05/03/2024) |
2024-05-08 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by June 4, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/8/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/08/2024) |
2024-05-29 | 14 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 05/29/2024) |
2024-05-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by June 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/29/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 05/29/2024) |
2024-06-12 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 06/12/2024) |
2024-06-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 15 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report by July 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/13/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 06/13/2024) |
2024-07-12 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 07/12/2024) |
2024-07-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 16 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report by August 22, 2024. In the event that disputes remain, the parties shall include a proposed briefing schedule in their next status report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/15/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 07/15/2024) |
2024-08-22 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 08/22/2024) |
2024-08-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further status report by September 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/23/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 08/23/2024) |
2024-09-23 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 09/23/2024) |
2024-09-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further status report by October 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/24/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 09/24/2024) |
2024-10-23 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 10/23/2024) |
2024-10-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further status report by November 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/25/24. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/25/2024) |
2024-11-22 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 11/22/2024) |
2024-11-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file another status report or proposed briefing schedule by December 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/26/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/26/2024) |
2024-12-06 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Fee Briefing Schedule by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/06/2024) |
2024-12-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of 21 the parties' Joint Status Report, the Court hereby adopts the following schedule: Plaintiff's fee motion shall be filed by March 14, 2025. Defendant's Opposition shall be filed by April 11, 2025. Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by April 25, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/10/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/10/2024) |
2025-03-10 | 22 | Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/10/2025) |
2025-03-11 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion to Modify Deadlines. Plaintiff's fee motion shall be filed by March 28, 2025. Defendant's Opposition shall be filed by April 25, 2025. Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed by May 9, 2025. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/11/2025. (lccrc1) Modified on 3/13/2025 (zlsj). (Entered: 03/11/2025) |
2025-03-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/28/2025. Responses due by 4/25/2025 and Replies due by 5/9/2025. (lsj) (Entered: 03/13/2025) |
2025-03-28 | 23 | MOTION for Attorney Fees by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Declaration Farnsworth, # 18 Declaration Vaughan, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/28/2025) |
2025-04-25 | 24 | Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 04/25/2025) |
2025-05-09 | 25 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 Motion for Attorney Fees, filed by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Declaration Second Farnsworth Decl., # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 05/09/2025) |
Hide Docket Events |