Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVOLLMANN v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv00939
Date Filed2012-06-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Florence Y. Pan
PlaintiffWILLIAM T. VOLLMANN
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
TERMINATED: 09/19/2012
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
TERMINATED: 09/19/2012
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [48]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-06-081COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616048928) filed by WILLIAM T. VOLLMANN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
2012-06-08SUMMONS (4) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
2012-07-082Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/08/2012)
2012-07-093ORDER granting 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint; and defendants shall file an answer on orbefore July 30, 2012.. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/9/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
2012-07-274ANSWER to 1 Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
2012-07-30MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCVR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants may have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, to file a report setting forth the schedule according to which Defendants will complete their production of documents to the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 7/30/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
2012-08-295MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Lutz Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
2012-08-296RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
2012-08-317ORDER: Upon consideration of the FBIs scheduling request that has been consented to by Plaintiff, the Court hereby sets the briefing schedule in this matter as follows: Defendant FBI the shall file its dispositive motion on or before December 17, 2012; The Plaintiff may file any Opposition by January 18, 2013; Defendant may file any Reply within 10 days of service of the Opposition.Plaintiff may file a cross-motion for summary judgment on or before January 18, 2013; Defendant may file any opposition to the cross-motion within 17 days of service of the cross-motion; Plaintiff may file any Reply within 10 days of service of the Opposition. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 8/31/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
2012-09-138STIPULATION of Dismissal With Respect to Defendant CIA by WILLIAM T. VOLLMANN. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
2012-09-19MINUTE ORDER: ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT CENTRAL INTELLIGENT AGENCY. Consistent with the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Plaintiff and the Central Intelligence Agency, this action is here by dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 9/19/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
2012-12-179Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file summary judgment motion by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
2012-12-18MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file summary judgment motion; Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion shall be filed by December 19,2012. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 12/18/2012. (tcb) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
2012-12-1910MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Hardy Declaration, # 2 Hardy Dec exhibits A-I, # 3 Hardy Dec exhibit J (Vollman 1-785, # 4 Hardy Dec exhibit K, # 5 ICE Vaughn Index, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
2013-01-1611Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partially) and to Stay Further Proceedings by WILLIAM T. VOLLMANN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
2013-01-1712ORDER granting 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Partially) and to Stay Further Proceedings; ORDERED that plaintiffs claims with respect to the Federal Bureau of Investigations processing of a total of 785 pages responsive to plaintiffs FOIA/PA request are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with the parties to pay their own fees, costs and expenses; it is FURTHER ORDERED that further proceedings in this action are stayed until November 15, 2013; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a report with the Court no later than November 15, 2013, advising the Court of the status of any documents remaining at issue. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 1/17/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
2013-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert L. Wilkins on 1/17/2013. (tcb) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
2013-04-04Case reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Judge Robert L. Wilkins no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
2013-08-05MINUTE ORDER. The Court acknowledges that the proceedings in this matter have been stayed until November 15, 2013, at which time the parties will submit a status report on the remaining documents; however, in light of the Defendant's representation that Defendant would "initiate an inquiry concerning the availability of the records for review in August 2013," is is HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than September 2, 2013, the parties submit an interim status report advising the Court of any progress made in reviewing the remaining documents. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/05/2013. (lckbj1) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
2013-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Interim Status Report due by 9/2/2013 (gdf) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
2013-09-0313STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-11-1414STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
2013-11-18MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE: Upon consideration of the representations made in the status report filed on November 14, 2013, it is ORDERED that the stay in this matter is extended until February 17, 2014; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a report no later than February 17, 2014 advising the Court as to the status of any documents remaining at issue. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/18/2013. (lckbj1) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
2013-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/17/2014. (gdf) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
2014-02-1915STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-02-20MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE: Upon consideration of the representations made in the status report filed on February 19, 2014, it is ORDERED that the stay in this matter is extended until May 20, 2014; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a report no later than May 20, 2014 advising the Court as to the status of any documents remaining at issue. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/20/2014. (lckbj1, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
2014-05-2016STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
2014-05-22MINUTE ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/5/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/22/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
2014-06-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Status Conference held on 6/5/2014. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Barbara De Vico) (gdf) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
2014-06-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the representations that the parties made at the status conference held on June 5, 2014, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a status report no later than July 14, 2014, updating the Court on (1) any progress that has been made on the completion of the background checks for the contractor employees that are to perform the remediation of the damaged records and (2) its research into the nature of the documents contained in the damaged file. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/30/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-07-1017RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Set Deadlines,,,, filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Second Hardy declaration)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the representations that Defendant made in 17 its Response to this Court's Minute Order of June 30, 2014, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a status report by September 7, 2014, and every 45 days thereafter, updating the Court on any progress that has been made on (1) the clearance of the facility where the document remediation will take place, (2) the completion of the background checks for the contractor employees that are to perform the document remediation, and (3) any other steps that need to be taken before the document remediation can begin. Once the document remediation begins, the reports shall update the Court on the status of the remediation of the documents at issue in this case, including an estimate of when the contractors will complete remediation of those documents. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/23/2014. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
2014-09-0818RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Set Deadlines,,,,,, filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 FBI Declaration)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
2014-09-0919NOTICE of Change of Address by David L. Sobel (Sobel, David) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
2014-10-2120STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-12-0821STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Hardy Declaration)(Fields, Rhonda) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/10/2014) (jf, ). Modified on 12/10/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/08/2014)
2015-01-2022STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Fourth Hardy Declaration)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
2015-01-2023ERRATA by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 22 Status Report filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fields, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
2015-02-2524NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Rhonda Fields (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
2015-03-0425STATUS REPORT - March 2015 by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
2015-04-2126STATUS REPORT April 2015 by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBarnette, Andrea) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
2015-05-2027NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Fred Elmore Haynes on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Andrea McBarnette (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
2015-06-0528STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-07-2029STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
2015-09-0330STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-10-1931STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-11-3032STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2016-01-1433STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
2016-02-2934STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-04-1535Final STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in Defendants' 35 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer a file status report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary, on or before 5/3/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/19/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
2016-05-0336Joint STATUS REPORT by WILLIAM T. VOLLMANN. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-05-04MINUTE ORDER: Based on the representations in the parties' 36 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule is set for briefing Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees in this matter: Plaintiff's motion is due by 6/10/2016; Defendants' response is due by 7/8/2016; Plaintiff's reply is due by 7/22/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/4/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-06-1037MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by WILLIAM T. VOLLMANN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - H, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-07-0838Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-08MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 38 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Defendant's response re 37 is due on or before 7/18/2016. Plaintiff's reply re 37 is due on or before 8/8/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/08/2016. (lckbj1) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-1839Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
2016-07-22MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, 39 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, nunc pro tunc. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' opposition to 37 is due on or before 7/25/2016, and that Plaintiff's reply in further support of 37 is due on or before 8/10/2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/22/2016. (lckbj1, ) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2540Memorandum in opposition to re 37 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Sixth Hardy Declaration)(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-08-0941REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by WILLIAM T. VOLLMANN. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2019-06-2542NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Peter C. Pfaffenroth on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Fred E. Haynes (Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 06/25/2019)
2021-06-22Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been elevated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit. She is therefore no longer assigned to this case, and this matter has been reassigned to the Calendar Committee, which will oversee it until it is assigned to another district judge. Any questions should be directed to Judge Jackson's former deputy clerk, Gwendolyn Franklin, at 202-354-3145 or gwen_franklin@dcd.uscourts.gov. (rj) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-10-01Case directly reassigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been appointed to the D.C. Circuit and is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-12-0743NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by WILLIAM T. VOLLMANN (Sobel, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-08MINUTE ORDER. Defendants may file a Response that addresses Plaintiff's 43 Notice of Supplemental Authority by December 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 12/8/21. (lcaa) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-0844NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Peter C. Pfaffenroth (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 12/22/2021. (zacr) (Entered: 12/09/2021)
2021-12-1545Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-16MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority, for good cause shown. Defendants' response is due on January 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 12/16/21. (lcaa) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response due by 1/26/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2022-01-2646RESPONSE re 43 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY and Notice of Additional Supplemental Authority filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/26/2022)
2022-04-1447ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant is directed to pay Plaintiff $9,491.70 in attorney's fees by May 16, 2022, unless the parties reach an alternative mutually agreeable date. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/14/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-1448MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/14/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar